Chitwood v. Bacon et al
Plaintiff: Joanne Chitwood
Defendant: Katherine Bacon and John Edmund Bacon
Case Number: 3:2020cv00122
Filed: June 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: H Russel Holland
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Katherine Bacon.(Gerd, Brian)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Katherine Bacon. (Gerd, Brian)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian V. Gerd on behalf of Katherine Bacon (Gerd, Brian)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joanne Chitwood (Lee, Huhnkie)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re Service of Summons and Complaint. Plaintiff to have the defendants served forthwith and file proofs of service upon receipt of a process server's return. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STATUS REPORT by Joanne Chitwood. (Lee, Huhnkie)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER; Proofs of service due within seven days or file a status report concerning service of the complaint on defendants Bacon. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Unissued summons re Defendant John Edmund Bacon, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant Katherine Bacon)(KMC, COURT STAFF)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Summons Issued as to John Edmund Bacon and Katherine Bacon. (KMC, COURT STAFF)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COMPLAINT against John Edmund Bacon, Katherine Bacon (Filing fee $400/receipt #097--2884857.), filed by Joanne Chitwood.(Lee, Huhnkie) Modified on 6/3/2020 to add receipt number(PXS, COURT STAFF).
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Civil Cover Sheet. (Lee, Huhnkie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chitwood v. Bacon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne Chitwood
Represented By: Huhnkie Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine Bacon
Represented By: Brian V. Gerd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Edmund Bacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?