In the Matter of the Complaint of William Martz et al
Plaintiff: Jane Martz, William Martz, Andrew Horazdovsky and Nautique vessel
Defendant: Betty Barce, Douglas Barce, Darren Barce, Reagan Martz and No Defendant - Entered for Statistical Purposes Only
Trustee: Jacob Alexander Sonneborn
Case Number: 3:2020cv00152
Filed: June 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 46:1101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2020 Filing 33 SLG TEXT ORDER: In light of the briefing schedule for the Limitation Plaintiffs Cross Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the Issue of Timeliness #24 , the hearing on August 27, 2020 is VACATED and hereby rescheduled to September 3, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. in Virtual Courtroom 3. The Court expects all parties to appear by videoconference unless they do not have video capabilities. Counsel shall refer to instructions to access the virtual courtroom at the separate sealed entry at docket #31 . Counsel is instructed to check the Court website at https://www.akd.uscourts.gov/virtual-courtrooms for any updated connection information prior to the hearing date. (CFR, CHAMBERS STAFF)
August 13, 2020 Filing 32 RESPONSE in Opposition re #24 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial) on the Issue of Timeliness filed by Andrew Horazdovsky. (Pace, Daniel)
August 13, 2020 Filing 31 SEALED ORDER: Video-conferenced hearing, 8/27/2020 at 2:00 p.m. Virtual Courtroom 3 Quick Guide connection information. Participants should use Option B of the Quick Guide for the hearing. (CFR, CHAMBERS STAFF)
August 13, 2020 Filing 30 SLG TEXT ORDER: The Request for Oral Argument on Andrew Horazdovskys Motion for Summary Judgment and William and Jane Martzs Cross Motion for Summary Judgment at docket #29 is GRANTED. The hearing will be held by videoconference on August 27, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. in Virtual Courtroom 3. Counsel will receive instructions to access the virtual courtroom in a separate sealed docket entry. Counsel is instructed to check the Court website at https://www.akd.uscourts.gov/virtual-courtrooms for any updated connection information prior to the hearing date. (CFR, CHAMBERS STAFF)
August 7, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION for Hearing re #19 MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing Complaint, Vacating Injunction and Award of Reasonable Attorneys Fees, #24 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial) on the Issue of Timeliness by Andrew Horazdovsky.(Pace, Daniel)
August 7, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Ian Pace on behalf of Andrew Horazdovsky (Pace, Daniel)
August 6, 2020 Filing 27 REPLY to Response to Motion re #19 MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing Complaint, Vacating Injunction and Award of Reasonable Attorneys Fees ANDREW HORAZDOVSKYS REPLY TO LIMITATION PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Andrew Horazdovsky. (Metzger, Yale)
July 30, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Filing Affidavit of Publication by Jane Martz, William Martz, Nautique vessel re 17 Ex Parte Order,, Terminate Motions, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Aff of Publication)(Katcher, Jonathon)
July 23, 2020 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in support of RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing Complaint, Vacating Injunction and Award of Reasonable Attorneys Fees filed by Jane Martz, William Martz. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit Ex.A. - W. Martz Affidavit, #3 Exhibit Ex. B - J. Martz Affidavit, #4 Exhibit Ex. C - J. Katcher Affidavit, #5 Exhibit Ex. D - Complaint Cover Page)(Bush, Cheryl) Modified on 7/24/2020 to clarify docket text (JLH, COURT STAFF).
July 23, 2020 Filing 24 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial) on the Issue of Timeliness by Jane Martz, William Martz.(Bush, Cheryl)
July 23, 2020 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing Complaint, Vacating Injunction and Award of Reasonable Attorneys Fees filed by Jane Martz, William Martz. (Bush, Cheryl)
July 13, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE DECLARATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF APPOINTMENT AS TRUSTEE by Jacob Alexander Sonneborn (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Vessel Title)(Sonneborn, Jacob)
July 9, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Alexander Sonneborn as Trustee (Sonneborn, Jacob) Modified on 7/10/2020 to clarify docket text (JLH, COURT STAFF).
July 6, 2020 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jane Martz, William Martz, Nautique vessel re service of Docket Nos. 1 and 3-17 (Bush, Cheryl)
July 3, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing Complaint, Vacating Injunction and Award of Reasonable Attorneys Fees by Andrew Horazdovsky. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Metzger, Yale)
July 3, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Yale H. Metzger on behalf of Andrew Horazdovsky (Metzger, Yale)
June 29, 2020 Filing 16 SLG TEXT ORDER: The Court hereby amends its order at Docket #13 granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Expedite. The Court will enter its rulings on Plaintiffs' motions on or before June 30, 2020.(RMC, COURT STAFF)
June 29, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Proposed Trustee by Jane Martz, William Martz, Nautique vessel re #8 First MOTION Appoint Trustee on Expedited Consideration (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Appointing Trustee)(Katcher, Jonathon)
June 29, 2020 Filing 14 SLG TEXT ORDER: Plaintiffs Motion to Appoint Trustee at Docket #8 does not propose a trustee. By 5:00 p.m. Alaska Daylight Time, June 29, 2020, Plaintiffs shall file a notice that either proposes a specific trustee or explains why a trustee should not be identified in an order granting their motion. (CFR, CHAMBERS STAFF)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Expedite. The Court will enter its rulings on Plaintiffs' motions on or before 6/29/2020. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 6/26/20. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
June 25, 2020 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE re #3 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Cheryl A. Bush, at docket #3 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (JLH, COURT STAFF)
June 25, 2020 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion for Expedited Consideratioin by Jane Martz, William Martz, Nautique vessel #8 First MOTION Appoint Trustee on Expedited Consideration filed by Jane Martz, William Martz, Nautique vessel, #6 First MOTION Fix Costs on Expedited Consideration filed by Jane Martz, William Martz, Nautique vessel, #10 First MOTION to Expedite on Prelim Injunc; Fix Costs; Appoint Trustee filed by Jane Martz, William Martz, Nautique vessel, #4 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Expedited Consideration filed by Jane Martz, William Martz, Nautique vessel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1, #2 Exhibit Ex 2)(Katcher, Jonathon)
June 25, 2020 Filing 10 First MOTION to Expedite on Prelim Injunc; Fix Costs; Appoint Trustee by Jane Martz, William Martz, Nautique vessel. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavits Verifying Motion, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Katcher, Jonathon)
June 25, 2020 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion to Appoint Trustee by Jane Martz, William Martz, Nautique vessel #8 First MOTION Appoint Trustee on Expedited Consideration filed by Jane Martz, William Martz, Nautique vessel. (Katcher, Jonathon)
June 25, 2020 Filing 8 First MOTION Appoint Trustee on Expedited Consideration by Jane Martz, William Martz, Nautique vessel. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavits Verifying Motion, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Katcher, Jonathon)
June 25, 2020 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM In Support of Motion to Fix Costs by Jane Martz, William Martz, Nautique vessel #6 First MOTION Fix Costs on Expedited Consideration filed by Jane Martz, William Martz, Nautique vessel. (Katcher, Jonathon)
June 25, 2020 Filing 6 First MOTION Fix Costs on Expedited Consideration by Jane Martz, William Martz, Nautique vessel. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavits Verifying Motion, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Katcher, Jonathon)
June 25, 2020 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion for Prelim Injunction by Jane Martz, William Martz, Nautique vessel #4 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Expedited Consideration filed by Jane Martz, William Martz, Nautique vessel. (Katcher, Jonathon)
June 25, 2020 Filing 4 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Expedited Consideration by Jane Martz, William Martz, Nautique vessel. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavits Verifying Motion, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Katcher, Jonathon)
June 25, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Cheryl A. Bush. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2895974.) by Jane Martz, William Martz, Nautique vessel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Katcher, Jonathon)
June 25, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Katcher, Jonathon)
June 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Limitation Liability against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2895955.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1, #2 Affidavit Aff'd Verifying Complaint)(Katcher, Jonathon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In the Matter of the Complaint of William Martz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Martz
Represented By: Cheryl A. Bush
Represented By: Jonathon A. Katcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Martz
Represented By: Cheryl A. Bush
Represented By: Jonathon A. Katcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Horazdovsky
Represented By: Yale H. Metzger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nautique vessel
Represented By: Cheryl A. Bush
Represented By: Jonathon A. Katcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betty Barce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Barce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darren Barce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reagan Martz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: No Defendant - Entered for Statistical Purposes Only
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Jacob Alexander Sonneborn
Represented By: Jacob Alexander Sonneborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?