Weseman v. Alyeska Pipeline Service Company
Plaintiff: Carrie Weseman
Defendant: Alyeska Pipeline Service Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv00160
Filed: July 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: H Russel Holland
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 623
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2020 Filing 12 REPLY in Support re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Alyeska Pipeline Service Company. (Broadwell, Michael) Modified on 8/7/2020 to clarify docket text (JLH, COURT STAFF).
July 27, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Carrie Weseman. (Zorea, Isaac)
July 15, 2020 Filing 10 ERRATA by Alyeska Pipeline Service Company #9 Notice (Other) filed by Alyeska Pipeline Service Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hodes, Elizabeth)
July 14, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of FIling All State Court Documents by Alyeska Pipeline Service Company (Hodes, Elizabeth)
July 14, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Service List by Alyeska Pipeline Service Company (Hodes, Elizabeth)
July 7, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (KMC, COURT STAFF) Modified on 7/8/2020 to replace the attachment with the correct document. (KMC, COURT STAFF)
July 6, 2020 Filing 6 STATEMENT Corporate Disclosure by Alyeska Pipeline Service Company. (Hodes, Elizabeth)
July 6, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Alyeska Pipeline Service Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hodes, Elizabeth)
July 6, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint [Amended] by Alyeska Pipeline Service Company.(Hodes, Elizabeth)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (KMC, COURT STAFF)
July 1, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet (KMC, COURT STAFF)
July 1, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Alyeska Pipeline Service Company from State of Alaska Third Judicial District, case number 3AN-19-11761CI. (Filing fee $ 400) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(KMC, COURT STAFF) Modified on 7/7/2020 to reflect corrected filer. (KMC, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weseman v. Alyeska Pipeline Service Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrie Weseman
Represented By: Isaac D. Zorea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alyeska Pipeline Service Company
Represented By: Elizabeth Pifke Hodes
Represented By: Michael Scott Broadwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?