Cook v. Saul
Plaintiff: Janae Leireigh Cook
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 3:2020cv00168
Filed: July 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Burgess
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2020 Docket Annotation: For the purpose of tracking the briefing as ordered at docket #9 , when filing the Opening Brief the attorney shall file the document using the event Motion Miscellaneous Relief and text in the relief being sought. Responsive filings should be filed using the event Response in Opposition to Motion or Response to Motion (Non-Opposition). The reply, if any, shall be filed using the event Reply to Response to Motion. (JDS, COURT STAFF)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER: Agency record due w/in 60 days of initial appearance; opening brief due w/in 30 days; answering brief due w/in 30 days; reply w/in 14 days. Signed by Judge Timothy M. Burgess on 8/27/2020. (JDS, COURT STAFF)
August 20, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin J. Groebner on behalf of Andrew M. Saul (Groebner, Benjamin)
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven E Skrocki on behalf of Andrew M. Saul (Skrocki, Steven)
July 30, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Janae Leireigh Cook. Andrew M. Saul served on 7/23/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. (Eaglin, Paul)
July 16, 2020 Summons Issued as to Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (JDS, COURT STAFF)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE AND RESPONSE granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Service to be completed within 90 days; Clerk to issue summonses and send to plaintiff; Answer due 60 days after receipt. Signed by Judge Timothy M. Burgess on 7/16/2020. (JDS, COURT STAFF)
July 14, 2020 Filing 4 Unissued summons re Defendant US Attorney for the District of Alaska, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant Region X Chief Counsel, SSA, for Comm'r SSA, #2 Unissued Summons re Defendant Honorable William P. Barr, Esq.)(KMC, COURT STAFF)
July 14, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Janae Leireigh Cook.(KMC, COURT STAFF)
July 14, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet (KMC, COURT STAFF)
July 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul, filed by Janae Leireigh Cook.(KMC, COURT STAFF) Modified on 7/16/2020 to edit dkt text (JDS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cook v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Benjamin J. Groebner
Represented By: Steven E Skrocki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janae Leireigh Cook
Represented By: Paul B. Eaglin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?