Tocci v. Saul
Plaintiff: Kimberly Tocci
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 3:2020cv00202
Filed: August 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kimberly Tocci. Andrew Saul served on 9/24/2020, answer due 11/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Dellert, Christopher)
September 25, 2020 Docket Annotation: For the purpose of tracking the briefing as ordered at docket #10 , when filing the Opening Brief the attorney shall file the document using the event Motion Miscellaneous Relief and text in the relief being sought. Responsive filings should be filed using the event Response in Opposition to Motion or Response to Motion (Non-Opposition). The reply, if any, shall be filed using the event Reply to Response to Motion. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER: Agency record due w/in 60 days of initial appearance; opening brief due w/in 30 days; answering brief due w/in 30 days; reply w/in 14 days. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 9/25/20. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
September 24, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven E Skrocki on behalf of Andrew Saul (Skrocki, Steven)
September 9, 2020 Filing 8 SLG TEXT ORDER: The Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Christopher Dellert, at docket #5 , is hereby GRANTED. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
August 28, 2020 Filing 7 ADDITIONAL RELATED DOCUMENT - Certificate of Good Standing by Kimberly Tocci re #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Christopher H. Dellert. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2926939.). (Dellert, Christopher)
August 24, 2020 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General (JLH, COURT STAFF)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE AND RESPONSE: Application to Waive File Fee at Docket #3 is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court to issue summons. Defendant to file Answer/Response w/in 60 days. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 8/24/20. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
August 21, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Christopher H. Dellert. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2926939.) by Kimberly Tocci. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Dellert, Christopher)
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 Unissued summons re Defendant Attorney General, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant Civil Chief, #2 Unissued Summons re Defendant Social Security Administration)(KMC, COURT STAFF)
August 21, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kimberly Tocci.(KMC, COURT STAFF)
August 21, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet (KMC, COURT STAFF)
August 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul, filed by Kimberly Tocci.(KMC, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tocci v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Steven E Skrocki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Tocci
Represented By: Christopher H. Dellert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?