Davis v. Jones
Petitioner: Benjamin Davis
Respondent: State of Alaska and Brandon Jones
Case Number: 3:2020cv00274
Filed: October 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: James K Singleton
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by Brandon Jones (Attachments: #1 3AN-06-10238CR Criminal Record (Part 1 of 2), #2 3AN-06-10238CR Criminal Record (Part 2 of 2), #3 3AN-06-10238CR Criminal Transcripts, #4 A-10144 Appellant Brief, #5 A-10144 Appellee Brief, #6 A-10144 Memorandum Opinion, #7 A-10144 Petition for Review, #8 3AN-17-04137CI PCR Record, #9 A-13063 Appellant Brief, #10 A-13063 Appellee Brief, #11 A-13063 Reply Brief, #12 A-13063 Summary Disposition, #13 S-17793 Petition for Hearing, #14 S-17793 Response to Petition, #15 S-17793 Order)(Ringsmuth, Eric)
December 14, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Alan Ringsmuth on behalf of Brandon Jones (Ringsmuth, Eric)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE AND RESPONSE: On or before December 30, 2020, Mr. Davis shall submit to this Court the $5.00 filing fee for maintaining this action or file a valid and complete Application to Waive Prepayment of the Filing Fee. Failure to comply with this order will result in the dismissal of this action. Notice of appearance to be filed no more than fourteen (14) days from the date of this order. Respondent shall file and serve either an answer or a motion in response to the Petition within sixty (60) days from the date of this Order. Petitioner's reply, if any, shall be filed and served within thirty (30) days of service of an answer. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge James K. Singleton, Jr on 11/30/2020. (SDW, COURT STAFF)
November 19, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE Regarding Exhaustion and the Statute of Limitations by Benjamin Davis (Attachments: #1 SOA Petition for Hearing, #2 SOA Order Petition for Hearing, #3 SOA Motion for Stay, #4 SOA Order Motion for Stay)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Show Cause Response or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal due by 12/11/2020. #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge James K. Singleton, Jr on 11/10/2020. (SDW, COURT STAFF) Modified on 11/10/2020 to reflect change to an opinion. (SDW, COURT STAFF)
November 3, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Benjamin Davis.(PXS, COURT STAFF)
October 28, 2020 Filing 2 Docket Annotation: Your habeas action at docket number #1 is deficient because you did not pay the $5.00 filing fee and you did not file an Application to Waive Prepayment of the Filing Fee. Please correct the deficiency/deficiencies noted above by submitting the $5.00 filing fee OR a fully completed and signed Application to Waive Prepayment of the Filing Fee. A blank copy of this Courts Form PS10 is attached. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
October 26, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus 28:2254, filed by Benjamin Davis. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Alaska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brandon Jones
Represented By: Eric Alan Ringsmuth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Benjamin Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?