Burns v. Juul Labs, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Burns
Defendant: eLiquitech, Inc., James Monsees, Alternative Ingrediants, Inc., Mother Murphy's Labs, Inc., ZLAB, S.A., Adam Bowen, Altria Client Services LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company, Riaz Valani, Juul Labs, Inc., ALTRIA Group, Inc., Philip Morris USA, Inc., Tobacco Technoloy, Inc., ZIIP Lab Co., LTD, Hoyoung Huh, Nicholas Pritzker and Altria Enterprises LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00291
Filed: November 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Referring Judge: John W Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2020 Filing 11 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FINALIZED (CTO-49) - 1 action(s) re: pldg. (1 in AK/3:20-cv-00291, 696 in MDL No. 2913) Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. This case is transferred to the Northern District of California for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
December 4, 2020 Case transferred to Northern District of California. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
November 20, 2020 Filing 10 Unissued summons re Defendant JUUL Labs, Inc, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant Alternative Ingredients, Inc., #2 Unissued Summons re Defendant Altria Enterprises LLC, #3 Unissued Summons re Defendant Altria Group, Inc., #4 Unissued Summons re Defendant Eliquitech, Inc, #5 Unissued Summons re Defendant Mother Murphys Labs Inc., #6 Unissued Summons re Defendant Nicholas Pritzker, #7 Unissued Summons re Defendant Riaz Valani, #8 Unissued Summons re Defendant ZLAB, S.A., #9 Unissued Summons re Defendant ZIIP Lab Co., Ltd., #10 Unissued Summons re Defendant Tobacco Technology, Inc., #11 Unissued Summons re Defendant Philip Morris USA, Inc., #12 Unissued Summons re Defendant James Monsees, #13 Unissued Summons re Defendant Hoyoung Huh, #14 Unissued Summons re Defendant Adam Bowen, #15 Unissued Summons re Defendant - Altria Group Distribution Compnay, #16 Unissued Summons re Defendant Altria Client Services LLC)(KMC, COURT STAFF)
November 20, 2020 Summons Issued as to ALTRIA Group, Inc., Alternative Ingrediants, Inc., Altria Client Services LLC, Altria Enterprises LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company, Adam Bowen, Hoyoung Huh, Juul Labs, Inc., James Monsees, Mother Murphy's Labs, Inc., Philip Morris USA, Inc., Nicholas Pritzker, Tobacco Technoloy, Inc., Riaz Valani, ZIIP Lab Co., LTD, ZLAB, S.A., eLiquitech, Inc.. (KMC, COURT STAFF)
November 18, 2020 Filing 9 JMK TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Judge Joshua M. Kindred hereby recuses himself from the above-referenced case. Pursuant to the system of random case assignments, this action is reassigned to Judge Sharon L. Gleason for all further proceedings. Please use the following case number on all future filings: 3:20-cv-00291-SLG. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
November 18, 2020 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE re #4 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Fabrice N. Vincent, at docket #4 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (RMC, COURT STAFF)
November 18, 2020 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE re #3 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kartik S. Madiraju, at docket #3 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (RMC, COURT STAFF)
November 18, 2020 Filing 6 JWS TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. The assigned judge recuses from presiding in this case. This case has been re-assigned by random draw to Hon. Joshua M. Kindred. Henceforth the Case Number will be 3:20-cv-00291-JMK. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
November 17, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Ad Litem ad Litem by Joseph Burns. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sandberg, Peter)
November 17, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Vincent. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2973232.) by Joseph Burns. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(Sandberg, Peter)
November 17, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Madiraju. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2973223.) by Joseph Burns. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(Sandberg, Peter)
November 17, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Sandberg, Peter)
November 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2973216.), filed by Joseph Burns.(Sandberg, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burns v. Juul Labs, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: eLiquitech, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Monsees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alternative Ingrediants, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mother Murphy's Labs, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZLAB, S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altria Client Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altria Group Distribution Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riaz Valani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juul Labs, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALTRIA Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip Morris USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tobacco Technoloy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZIIP Lab Co., LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoyoung Huh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Pritzker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altria Enterprises LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Burns
Represented By: Peter A. Sandberg
Represented By: Fabrice Nijhof Vincent
Represented By: Kartik Sameer Madiraju
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?