Luke v. United States of America
Plaintiff: James A. Luke, Jr.
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2020cv00297
Filed: November 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2674
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2021 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT UNDER THE FEDERAL TORT CLAIMS ACT against United States of America, filed by James A. Luke, Jr.(Henderson, David)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 1/13/2021. (CFR, CHAMBERS STAFF)
January 8, 2021 Filing 5 First MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by James A. Luke, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended complaint, #2 Proposed Order Granting leave to amend)(Henderson, David)
December 11, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by James A. Luke, Jr (Henderson, David)
November 25, 2020 Filing 3 Unissued summons re Defendant US Attorney, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant USAG)(LMH, COURT STAFF)
November 25, 2020 Summons Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (LMH, COURT STAFF)
November 24, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Henderson, David)
November 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT UNDER THE FEDERAL TORT CLAIMS ACT against United States of America ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2976949.), filed by James A. Luke, Jr.(Henderson, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luke v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James A. Luke, Jr.
Represented By: David Nelson Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?