Kaspar v. Saul
Plaintiff: Susan Lynn Kaspar
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 3:2021cv00006
Filed: January 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Ralph R Beistline
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven E Skrocki on behalf of Andrew Saul (Skrocki, Steven)
February 9, 2021 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE re #3 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nancy J. Meserow, at docket #3 is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (SDW, COURT STAFF)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE AND RESPONSE: Application to Waive File Fee at Docket #4 is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court to issue summons. Defendant to file Answer/Response w/in 60 days. Signed by Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 1/29/21. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
January 29, 2021 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
January 27, 2021 Filing 6 Receipt of 150 non-resident attorney payment for Nancy Meserow as to Plaintiff Susan Lynn Kaspar re #3 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Nancy J. Meserow (PXS, COURT STAFF)
January 12, 2021 Filing 5 Unissued summons re Defendant Andrew Saul, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant Office of General Counsel, #2 Unissued Summons re Defendant Attorney General USA)(KMC, COURT STAFF)
January 12, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Susan Lynn Kaspar.(KMC, COURT STAFF)
January 12, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Nancy J. Meserow by Susan Lynn Kaspar. (Attachments: #1 PHV Certificate)(KMC, COURT STAFF)
January 12, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet (KMC, COURT STAFF)
January 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul, filed by Susan Lynn Kaspar. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(KMC, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kaspar v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Steven E Skrocki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Lynn Kaspar
Represented By: Nancy J. Meserow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?