Givens v. Oenga Jr.
Plaintiff: Raymond C. Givens
Defendant: Leroy Oenga Jr.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00008
Filed: January 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: H Russel Holland
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER accepting #6 Status Report. Plaintiff to advise the court concerning service of the complaint and summons on defendant by 3/29/2021. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STATUS REPORT re Service of Complaint of Defendant by Raymond C. Givens. (Winner, Russell)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re Notice to Counsel. Plaintiff shall either file proof of service by seven days or file a status report concerning service of the complaint on defendant. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER RE MOTIONS TO DISMISS: Advising counsel of the procedure to follow prior to filing a motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 2/3/21. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Summons Issued as to Leroy Oenga Jr. (KMC, COURT STAFF)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Unissued summons re Defendant Leroy Oenga, Jr., (KMC, COURT STAFF)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Winner, Russell)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT Raymond C. Givens against Leroy Oenga Jr. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 097--3003386.), filed by Raymond C. Givens. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Winner, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Givens v. Oenga Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leroy Oenga Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond C. Givens
Represented By: Russell L. Winner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?