Watterson Construction Co. v. International Door, Inc.
Plaintiff: Watterson Construction Co.
Defendant: International Door, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00047
Filed: March 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Joshua M Kindred
Referring Judge: John W Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2021 Filing 12 DECLARATION of John Kaounas In Support of re #11 Reply to Response to Motion by International Door, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12)(Tavella, Anne)
April 19, 2021 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by International Door, Inc.. (Tavella, Anne)
April 6, 2021 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Watterson Construction Co.. (Bankston, William)
April 5, 2021 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Watterson Construction Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7 Affidavit Adler, #8 Exhibit 8 Affidavit Watterson)(Bankston, William)
March 22, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by International Door, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E)(Tavella, Anne)
March 15, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by International Door, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Tavella, Anne)
March 15, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by International Door, Inc.. (Tavella, Anne)
March 12, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by International Door, Inc. (Tavella, Anne)
March 5, 2021 Filing 4 JWS TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. The assigned judge recuses from presiding over this lawsuit. The case has been re-assigned by random draw to the Hon. Joshua M. Kindred. Henceforth the case number will be 3:21-cv-00047-JMK. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
March 2, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Tavella, Anne)
March 2, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by International Door, Inc. Removes This Case from Alaska Superior Court, Third Judicial District, case number 3AN-21-04368CI. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 097--3028267), filed by International Door, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Tavella, Anne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watterson Construction Co. v. International Door, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Door, Inc.
Represented By: Anne Marie Tavella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Watterson Construction Co.
Represented By: Suzanne A. Adler
Represented By: Douglas Alfred Karet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?