Hulsey et al v. Knopp et al
Plaintiff: William Alan Hulsey
Defendant: Sandra Bell, High Adventure Air Charter Guides and Outfitters, Inc., Helen Knopp, Helen Knopp HELEN KNOPP, individually and d/b/a G & H CONSTRUCTION, Soldotna Aircraft & Equipment Leasing, LLC and Cindy Lynn Rainey-Bell
Case Number: 3:2021cv00051
Filed: March 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: John W Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2021 Filing 25 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against High Adventure Air Charter Guides and Outfitters, Inc., Cindy Lynn Rainey-Bell by Helen Knopp(as Personal Representative of the ESTATE OF GARY KNOPP, deceased), Helen Knopp(HELEN KNOPP, individually and d/b/a G & H CONSTRUCTION).(Gilman, Blaine)
April 12, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Blaine D. Gilman on behalf of Helen Knopp(as Personal Representative of the ESTATE OF GARY KNOPP, deceased), Helen Knopp(HELEN KNOPP, individually and d/b/a G & H CONSTRUCTION) (Gilman, Blaine)
April 12, 2021 Docket Annotation: ERROR re #22 Additional Related Document : wrong event selected. Correction: Attorney to refile using the correct event Notice of Appearance. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
April 2, 2021 Filing 23 ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint, by Helen Knopp(as Personal Representative of the ESTATE OF GARY KNOPP, deceased), Helen Knopp(HELEN KNOPP, individually and d/b/a G & H CONSTRUCTION).(Gilman, Blaine)
April 2, 2021 Filing 22 ADDITIONAL RELATED DOCUMENT Entry of Appearance by Blaine Gilman by Helen Knopp(as Personal Representative of the ESTATE OF GARY KNOPP, deceased), Helen Knopp(HELEN KNOPP, individually and d/b/a G & H CONSTRUCTION). (Gilman, Blaine)
March 31, 2021 Filing 21 CLERK'S NOTICE re #13 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by James R. Brauchle, at docket #13 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (RMC, COURT STAFF)
March 31, 2021 Filing 20 CLERK'S NOTICE re #12 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mary Schiavo, at docket #12 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (RMC, COURT STAFF)
March 25, 2021 Filing 19 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to HELEN KNOPP d/b/a G&H CONSTRUCTION on 3/25/21 by William Alan Hulsey(Individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Mackay Alexander Hulsey, deceased), William Alan Hulsey(Individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Caleb Parker Hulsey, deceased), William Alan Hulsey(Individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Heather Nicole Dillard Hulsey, deceased). Waiver of Service due by 4/26/2021. (Schneider, Michael)
March 25, 2021 Filing 18 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to HELEN KNOPP, Individually on 3/25/21 by William Alan Hulsey(Individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Mackay Alexander Hulsey, deceased), William Alan Hulsey(Individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Caleb Parker Hulsey, deceased), William Alan Hulsey(Individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Heather Nicole Dillard Hulsey, deceased). Waiver of Service due by 4/26/2021. (Schneider, Michael)
March 25, 2021 Filing 17 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to HELEN KNOPP, as Personal Representative of the ESTATE OF GARY KNOPP, deceased on 3/25/21 by William Alan Hulsey(Individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Mackay Alexander Hulsey, deceased), William Alan Hulsey(Individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Caleb Parker Hulsey, deceased), William Alan Hulsey(Individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Heather Nicole Dillard Hulsey, deceased). Waiver of Service due by 4/26/2021. (Schneider, Michael)
March 25, 2021 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by William Alan Hulsey(Individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Mackay Alexander Hulsey, deceased), William Alan Hulsey(Individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Caleb Parker Hulsey, deceased), William Alan Hulsey(Individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Heather Nicole Dillard Hulsey, deceased). CINDY LYNN RAINEY-BELL waiver sent on 3/23/2021, answer due 5/24/2021. (Schneider, Michael)
March 23, 2021 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to CINDY LYNN RAINEY-BELL as Personal Representative of the ESTATE OF GREGORY BELL on 3/23/2021 by William Alan Hulsey(Individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Mackay Alexander Hulsey, deceased), William Alan Hulsey(Individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Caleb Parker Hulsey, deceased), William Alan Hulsey(Individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Heather Nicole Dillard Hulsey, deceased). Waiver of Service due by 4/22/2021. (Schneider, Michael)
March 23, 2021 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT [FIRST] against All Defendants, filed by William Alan Hulsey(Individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Mackay Alexander Hulsey, deceased), William Alan Hulsey(Individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Caleb Parker Hulsey, deceased), William Alan Hulsey(Individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Heather Nicole Dillard Hulsey, deceased).(Schneider, Michael)
March 22, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney JAMES R. BRAUCHLE. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $250.00 paid. Receipt number 097--3039797.) by William Alan Hulsey(Individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Mackay Alexander Hulsey, deceased), William Alan Hulsey(Individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Caleb Parker Hulsey, deceased), William Alan Hulsey(Individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Heather Nicole Dillard Hulsey, deceased).(Schneider, Michael)
March 22, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney MARY SCHIAVO. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $250.00 paid. Receipt number 097--3039795.) by William Alan Hulsey(Individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Mackay Alexander Hulsey, deceased), William Alan Hulsey(Individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Caleb Parker Hulsey, deceased), William Alan Hulsey(Individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Heather Nicole Dillard Hulsey, deceased).(Schneider, Michael)
March 17, 2021 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by William Alan Hulsey(Individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Mackay Alexander Hulsey, deceased), William Alan Hulsey(Individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Caleb Parker Hulsey, deceased), William Alan Hulsey(Individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Heather Nicole Dillard Hulsey, deceased). Soldotna Aircraft & Equipment Leasing, LLC waiver sent on 3/10/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. (Schneider, Michael)
March 17, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by William Alan Hulsey(Individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Mackay Alexander Hulsey, deceased), William Alan Hulsey(Individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Caleb Parker Hulsey, deceased), William Alan Hulsey(Individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Heather Nicole Dillard Hulsey, deceased). Sandra Bell waiver sent on 3/10/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. (Schneider, Michael)
March 17, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by William Alan Hulsey(Individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Mackay Alexander Hulsey, deceased), William Alan Hulsey(Individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Caleb Parker Hulsey, deceased), William Alan Hulsey(Individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Heather Nicole Dillard Hulsey, deceased). High Adventure Air Charter Guides and Outfitters, Inc. waiver sent on 3/10/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. (Schneider, Michael)
March 17, 2021 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to SANDRA BELL AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF GREGORY BELL on 3/10/21 by William Alan Hulsey(Individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Mackay Alexander Hulsey, deceased), William Alan Hulsey(Individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Caleb Parker Hulsey, deceased), William Alan Hulsey(Individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Heather Nicole Dillard Hulsey, deceased). Waiver of Service due by 4/9/2021. (Schneider, Michael)
March 17, 2021 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to HIGH ADVENTURE AIR CHARTER GUIDES AND OUTFITTERS, INC. on 3/10/21 by William Alan Hulsey(Individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Mackay Alexander Hulsey, deceased), William Alan Hulsey(Individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Caleb Parker Hulsey, deceased), William Alan Hulsey(Individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Heather Nicole Dillard Hulsey, deceased). Waiver of Service due by 4/9/2021. (Schneider, Michael)
March 17, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to SOLDOTNA AIRCRAFT & EQUIPMENT LEASING, LLC on 3/10/21 by William Alan Hulsey(Individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Mackay Alexander Hulsey, deceased), William Alan Hulsey(Individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Caleb Parker Hulsey, deceased), William Alan Hulsey(Individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Heather Nicole Dillard Hulsey, deceased). Waiver of Service due by 4/9/2021. (Schneider, Michael)
March 8, 2021 Filing 5 Unissued summons re Defendant S. Bell, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant GH, #2 Unissued Summons re Defendant H. Knopp, #3 Unissued Summons re Defendant High Adventure, #4 Unissued Summons re Defendant Soldotna, #5 Unissued Summons re Defendant H. Knop, Individually)(LMH, COURT STAFF)
March 8, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Sandra Bell, High Adventure Air Charter Guides and Outfitters, Inc., Helen Knopp(as Personal Representative of the ESTATE OF GARY KNOPP, deceased), Helen Knopp(HELEN KNOPP, individually and d/b/a G & H CONSTRUCTION), Soldotna Aircraft & Equipment Leasing, LLC. (LMH, COURT STAFF) Modified on 3/8/2021 to remove documents and regenerate (LMH, COURT STAFF).
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER RE MOTION TO DISMISS: Advising counsel of the procedure to follow prior to filing a motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 3/8/21. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
March 4, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Schneider, Michael)
March 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 097--3029602.), filed by All Plaintiffs.(Schneider, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hulsey et al v. Knopp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Alan Hulsey
Represented By: Michael J. Schneider
Represented By: Mary Schiavo
Represented By: James Richard Brauchle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: High Adventure Air Charter Guides and Outfitters, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helen Knopp
Represented By: Blaine D. Gilman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helen Knopp HELEN KNOPP, individually and d/b/a G & H CONSTRUCTION
Represented By: Blaine D. Gilman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soldotna Aircraft & Equipment Leasing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Lynn Rainey-Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?