Gray v. Saul
Plaintiff: Cheri Gray
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 3:2021cv00060
Filed: March 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Ralph R Beistline
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cheri Gray. Andrew Saul served on 3/29/2021, answer due 5/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Dellert, Christopher)
April 2, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven E Skrocki on behalf of Andrew Saul (Skrocki, Steven)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SOCIAL SECURITY ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE AND RESPONSE: Application to Waive File Fee at Docket #3 is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court to issue summons. Defendant to file Answer/Response w/in 60 days. Signed by Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 3/19/2021. (SDW, COURT STAFF)
March 19, 2021 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE re #5 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Christopher H. Dellert, at docket #5 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (SDW, COURT STAFF)
March 19, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Christopher H. Dellert. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $250.00 paid. Receipt number 097--3038686.) by Cheri Gray. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Dellert, Christopher)
March 18, 2021 Filing 4 Unissued summons re Defendant Andrew Saul, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant Attorney General, #2 Unissued Summons re Defendant Civil Chief U.S. Attorney's Office)(KMC, COURT STAFF)
March 18, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Cheri Gray.(KMC, COURT STAFF)
March 18, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet (KMC, COURT STAFF)
March 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul, filed by Cheri Gray.(KMC, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gray v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Steven E Skrocki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheri Gray
Represented By: Christopher H. Dellert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?