Alli v. Saul
Plaintiff: Alicia Alli
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 3:2021cv00087
Filed: April 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Burgess
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SOCIAL SECURITY ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE AND RESPONSE: Application to Waive File Fee #4 is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court to issue summons. Defendant to file Answer/Response w/in 60 days. Signed by Judge Timothy M. Burgess on 6/2/2021. (JDS, COURT STAFF)
June 2, 2021 Summons Issued as to Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (JDS, COURT STAFF)
May 28, 2021 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE re #5 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kevin Sean Kerr, at docket #5 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (JDS, COURT STAFF)
May 26, 2021 Filing 7 Receipt of 250.00 non-resident attorney payment for Kevin Kerr as to Plaintiff Alicia Alli. re #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Kevin Kerr (PXS, COURT STAFF)
May 21, 2021 Filing 6 Certificate in Good Standing by Alicia Alli (Kerr, Kevin) Modified on 5/21/2021 to link to #5 . (BJK, COURT STAFF).
May 21, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Kevin Kerr by Alicia Alli.(Kerr, Kevin)
April 8, 2021 Filing 4 Application to Waive the Filing Fee by Alicia Alli.(LMH, COURT STAFF)
April 8, 2021 Filing 3 Unissued summons re Defendant USAO, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant Clarkson, #2 Unissued Summons re Defendant SSA)(LMH, COURT STAFF) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/2/2021: #1 Unissued summons re Defendant USAG, #2 Unissued summons re Defendant OGC) Modified on 6/2/2021 to replace PDFs w/corrected summons (JDS, COURT STAFF).
April 8, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet (LMH, COURT STAFF)
April 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul, filed by Alicia Alli.(LMH, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alli v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alicia Alli
Represented By: Kevin Sean Kerr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?