Imbriani et al v. Quinn-Davidson
Plaintiff: Holly Derivera, Louis Imbriani, Hockey Officials of Alaska, Brian Johnson, Robert Rubey and Michael Hanifen
Defendant: Austin Quinn-Davidson
Case Number: 3:2021cv00105
Filed: April 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Burgess
Referring Judge: H Russel Holland
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss [UNOPPOSED Motion for Extension of Time] by Holly Derivera, Michael Hanifen, Hockey Officials of Alaska, Louis Imbriani, Brian Johnson, Robert Rubey. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Counsel, #2 Proposed Order)(Stone, Stacey)
June 7, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by Austin Quinn-Davidson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Botstein, Ruth)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. Defendant Austin Quinn-Davidson's Answer is now due on or before June 7, 2021. (NMG, CHAMBERS STAFF)
May 27, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (Unopposed) by Austin Quinn-Davidson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Counsel ISO Motion, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Botstein, Ruth)
May 27, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Ruth Botstein on behalf of All Defendants (Botstein, Ruth)
May 4, 2021 Filing 4 HRH TEXT ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to the system of random case reassignment, this action is reassigned to Judge Timothy M. Burgess for all further proceedings. Please use the following case number on all future filings: 3:21-cv-00105-TMB. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
May 3, 2021 Filing 3 Unissued summons re Defendant A. Quinn-Davidson, (LMH, COURT STAFF)
May 3, 2021 Summons Issued as to Austin Quinn-Davidson. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
April 30, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Stone, Stacey)
April 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Austin Quinn-Davidson ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 097--3064525.), filed by Louis Imbriani, Hockey Officials of Alaska, Robert Rubey, Holly Derivera, Brian Johnson, Michael Hanifen.(Stone, Stacey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Imbriani et al v. Quinn-Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Austin Quinn-Davidson
Represented By: Ruth Botstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holly Derivera
Represented By: Stacey C. Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Imbriani
Represented By: Stacey C. Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hockey Officials of Alaska
Represented By: Stacey C. Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Johnson
Represented By: Stacey C. Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Rubey
Represented By: Stacey C. Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Hanifen
Represented By: Stacey C. Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?