Katmai Water Taxi, LLC v. NW Bend Boats, LLC
Plaintiff: Katmai Water Taxi, LLC
Defendant: NW Bend Boats, LLC d/b/a North River Boats
Intervenor Plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Case Number: 3:2021cv00110
Filed: May 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Fact Discovery closes 6/30/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 8/30/2022. See Order for additional deadlines. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 7/2/21. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
June 30, 2021 Filing 27 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Southwick, Joshua)
June 17, 2021 Filing 26 CLERK'S NOTICE re #23 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by R. Kyle Hawes, at docket #23 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (JLH, COURT STAFF)
June 17, 2021 Filing 25 CLERK'S NOTICE re #22 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael B. Feibus, at docket #22 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (JLH, COURT STAFF)
June 17, 2021 Filing 24 CLERK'S NOTICE re #21 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by F. Daniel Knight, at docket #21 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (JLH, COURT STAFF)
June 17, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney R. KYLE HAWES. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $250.00 paid. Receipt number 097--3090268.) by Katmai Water Taxi, LLC.(Freeman, David)
June 17, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney MICHAEL B. FEIBUS. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $250.00 paid. Receipt number 097--3090264.) by Katmai Water Taxi, LLC.(Freeman, David)
June 17, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney F. DANIEL KNIGHT. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $250.00 paid. Receipt number 097--3090251.) by Katmai Water Taxi, LLC.(Freeman, David)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER RE INITIAL SCHEDULING & PLANNING CONFERENCE REPORT: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 21 days of service of this order. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 6/9/21. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
June 7, 2021 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NW Bend Boats, LLC. (McLean, Donald)
June 7, 2021 Filing 18 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint in Intervention by NW Bend Boats, LLC. (McLean, Donald)
June 7, 2021 Filing 17 AMENDED ANSWER to by NW Bend Boats, LLC. (McLean, Donald)
June 4, 2021 Filing 16 SLG TEXT ORDER: The Complaint in Intervention at Docket #6 is accepted for filing, in light of Defendant's apparent nonopposition to the intervention, as demonstrated by the Answer filed at Docket 13. Cf. Rule 24, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (requiring intervention to be sought [o]n timely motion). (JLH, COURT STAFF)
June 3, 2021 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE re #7 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Joshua A. Southwick, at docket #7 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (JLH, COURT STAFF)
June 2, 2021 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NW Bend Boats, LLC. (McLean, Donald)
June 2, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to #6 Intervenor Complaint by NW Bend Boats, LLC.(McLean, Donald)
June 2, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by NW Bend Boats, LLC.(McLean, Donald)
June 2, 2021 Filing 11 ADDITIONAL RELATED DOCUMENT Certificate of Good Standing by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America re #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Joshua Southwick. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $250.00 paid. Receipt number 097--3078284.). (Southwick, Joshua)
May 27, 2021 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on NV Bend Boats, LLC on 5/18/21, filed by Katmai Water Taxi, LLC. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
May 27, 2021 Filing 9 Unissued summons re Defendant NW Bend Boats, LLC, (LMH, COURT STAFF)
May 27, 2021 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM FOR MOTION AND APPLICATION OF NON-ELIGIBLE ATTORNEY FOR PERMISSION TO APPEAR AND PARTICIPATE IN THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF ALASKA by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Joshua Southwick. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $250.00 paid. Receipt number 097--3078284.) filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Southwick, Joshua)
May 27, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Joshua Southwick. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $250.00 paid. Receipt number 097--3078284.) by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America.(Southwick, Joshua)
May 27, 2021 Filing 6 Intervenor COMPLAINT , filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America.(Southwick, Joshua)
May 27, 2021 Summons Issued as to NW Bend Boats, LLC. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
May 25, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert D. Sykes on behalf of NW Bend Boats, LLC (McLean, Donald) Modified on 5/25/2021 to clarify docket text. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
May 25, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald K. McLean on behalf of NW Bend Boats, LLC (McLean, Donald)
May 11, 2021 Filing 3 Unissued summons re Defendant NW Bend Boats, LLC, (LMH, COURT STAFF)
May 11, 2021 Summons Issued as to NW Bend Boats, LLC. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
May 7, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Freeman, David)
May 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NW Bend Boats, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 097--3068927.), filed by Katmai Water Taxi, LLC.(Freeman, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Katmai Water Taxi, LLC v. NW Bend Boats, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NW Bend Boats, LLC d/b/a North River Boats
Represented By: Donald K. McLean
Represented By: Robert D. Sykes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katmai Water Taxi, LLC
Represented By: David M. Freeman
Represented By: F. Daniel Knight
Represented By: Michael B. Feibus
Represented By: R. Kyle Hawes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Represented By: Joshua A. Southwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?