Hickey v. USAA General Indemnity Company
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Hickey
Defendant: USAA General Indemnity Company
Case Number: 3:2021cv00112
Filed: May 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: John W Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2021 Filing 10 JWS TEXT ORDER: The Court has reviewed the notice at docket #9 . Based thereon, the parties need not comply with the order at docket #8 . Unless closing papers are sooner filed, a status report shall be filed in 35 days. (LLR, CHAMBERS STAFF)
June 10, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Settlement by USAA General Indemnity Company (Graves, Cheryl)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE INITIAL SCHEDULING & PLANNING CONFERENCE REPORT: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 21 days of service of this order. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 5/25/21. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
May 25, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by USAA General Indemnity Company.(Graves, Cheryl)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
May 7, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by USAA General Indemnity Company. (Graves, Cheryl)
May 7, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE to Parties of Filing Notice of Removal by USAA General Indemnity Company (Graves, Cheryl)
May 7, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by USAA General Indemnity Company (Graves, Cheryl)
May 7, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Graves, Cheryl)
May 7, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Palmer Superior Court, case number 3PA-21-01312 CI. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 097--3068707), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint)(Graves, Cheryl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hickey v. USAA General Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Hickey
Represented By: Gregory S. Parvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA General Indemnity Company
Represented By: Cheryl L. Graves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?