Polty v. Houser
Petitioner: William D Polty
Respondent: Earl Houser
Case Number: 3:2021cv00114
Filed: May 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Ralph R Beistline
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #7 Response to Order to Show Cause by William D Polty. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
June 9, 2021 Filing 7 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by William D Polty. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis #5 is GRANTED, and the $5.00 filing fee in this case is WAIVED. Show Cause Response due by 7/2/2021. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 6/2/2021. (SDW, COURT STAFF)
May 21, 2021 Filing 5 Prisoner's Application to Waive Prepayment of the Filing Fee by William D Polty.(LMH, COURT STAFF)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING DEFICIENT FILING: The Application to Waive Prepayment of the Filing Fee, at Docket #2 is denied without prejudice. Amended Application or filing fee due within 30 days. Signed by Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 5/13/21. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
May 12, 2021 Filing 3 JMK TEXT ORDER: By agreement of the Judges, this case is hereby reassigned to the Honorable Ralph R. Beistline for all further proceedings. Please use the following case number on all future filings: 3:21-cv-00114-RRB. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
May 11, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by William D Polty. (Attachments: #1 Account Statement)(DDS, Court Staff)
May 11, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus 28:2241, filed by William D Polty.(DDS, Court Staff)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Polty v. Houser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: William D Polty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Earl Houser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?