Hall v. Houser
Petitioner: Jamal Hall
Respondent: Earl Houser
Case Number: 3:2021cv00133
Filed: June 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Ralph R Beistline
Referring Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2021 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE: The Nature of Suit for this case is changed from 550 to 530 to reflect that this is a habeas action filed by a prisoner. This change is administrative in nature only. (SDW, COURT STAFF)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCREENING ORDER: The Petition, at Docket #1 , is DISMISSED with leave to amend. The Criminal Justice Act (CJA) authorizes the Court to appoint an attorney for a habeas petitioner. On or before August 9, 2021, Mr. Hall must file either (1) a request for court-appointed counsel on the enclosed Motion for Appointment of Counsel and Financial Affidavit, or (2) a Notice of Intent to Proceed Without Counsel, and to represent himself, or (3) a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice to exhausting his state court remedies. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 7/7/2021. (SDW, COURT STAFF)
July 2, 2021 Filing 3 SLG TEXT ORDER: By agreement of the judges, the above referenced case is hereby reassigned to the Honorable Ralph R. Beistline for all further proceedings. Henceforth, parties to use the following case caption for all future filings in 3:21-cv-00133-RRB. (SDW, COURT STAFF)
June 2, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet (DDS, Court Staff)
June 2, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus 28:2241 (Filing fee $ 5/Receipt #ANC017950), filed by Jamal Hall.(DDS, Court Staff)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall v. Houser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Earl Houser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jamal Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?