Nordlund v. Beesley et al
Plaintiff: David Christopher Nordlund
Defendant: Tigner and Beesley
Case Number: 3:2021cv00134
Filed: June 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Ralph R Beistline
Referring Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2021 Filing 9 RRB TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal at #8 is accepted. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1), the Court dismisses the case without prejudice.(SDW, COURT STAFF)
July 27, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by David Christopher Nordlund. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
July 27, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Consideration/Clarification by David Christopher Nordlund.(JLH, COURT STAFF)
July 12, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address by David Christopher Nordlund (PXS, COURT STAFF)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING STATUS OF STATE COURT CASES: Notice to the Court or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal due 7/30/2021. The Application to Waiver Prepayment of Filing Fee, at Docket #3 , is DEFERRED. Signed by Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 6/29/21. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
June 9, 2021 Filing 4 SLG TEXT ORDER: By agreement of the judges, the above referenced case is hereby reassigned to the Honorable Ralph R. Beistline for all further proceedings. Henceforth, parties to use the following case caption for all future filings in 3:21-cv-00134-RRB. (SDW, COURT STAFF)
June 2, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by David Christopher Nordlund. (Attachments: #1 Account Statement)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
June 2, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
June 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Beesley, Tigner, filed by David Christopher Nordlund. (Attachments: #1 1)(PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nordlund v. Beesley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tigner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beesley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Christopher Nordlund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?