In the Matter of William N. Dushkin and Marilyn J. Dushkin, as owners and operators of the F/V BOBBI DEE for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability
Defendant: No Defendant - Entered for Statistical Purposes Only
Petitioner: F/V BOBBI DEE, William N. Dushkin and Marilyn J. Dushkin
Case Number: 3:2021cv00138
Filed: June 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Monition. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 7/19/21. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION Monition by William N. Dushkin. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Monition, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(McLean, Donald)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against No Defendant - Entered for Statistical Purposes Only, filed by All Plaintiffs.(McLean, Donald)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying #3 Motion for Monition. Limitation Plaintiffs' Complaint at Docket #1 is dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim on which relief can be granted. Limitation Plaintiffs' may file an amended complaint and renewed motion for monition within 28 days, if able to do so in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure Supplemental Rules for Admiralty or Maritime Claims and Asset Forfeiture Actions Rule F. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 7/6/2021. (CFR, CHAMBERS STAFF) Modified on 7/6/2021 to change doc type to opinion. (SDW, COURT STAFF)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DECLARATION of Robert D. Sykes by Marilyn J. Dushkin, William N. Dushkin, F/V BOBBI DEE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter of Undertaking, #2 Exhibit Security of Costs Check)(McLean, Donald)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Posting Security by Marilyn J. Dushkin, William N. Dushkin, F/V BOBBI DEE (McLean, Donald)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Monition by Marilyn J. Dushkin, William N. Dushkin, F/V BOBBI DEE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Monition, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(McLean, Donald)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (McLean, Donald)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against No Defendant - Entered for Statistical Purposes Only ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 097--3082075.), filed by William N. Dushkin, Marilyn J. Dushkin, F/V BOBBI DEE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Value, #2 Exhibit 2017 Survey)(McLean, Donald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In the Matter of William N. Dushkin and Marilyn J. Dushkin, as owners and operators of the F/V BOBBI DEE for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: F/V BOBBI DEE
Represented By: Donald K. McLean
Represented By: Robert D. Sykes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: William N. Dushkin
Represented By: Donald K. McLean
Represented By: Robert D. Sykes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Marilyn J. Dushkin
Represented By: Donald K. McLean
Represented By: Robert D. Sykes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: No Defendant - Entered for Statistical Purposes Only
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?