Anderson v. Municipality of Anchorage
Plaintiff: Robert Anderson
Defendant: Municipality of Anchorage
Case Number: 3:2021cv00139
Filed: June 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Joshua M Kindred
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Reconsideration re #7 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File, by Robert Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
July 16, 2021 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading filed by Robert Anderson. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING SELF-REPRESENTED PLAINTIFF; granted in part #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Response due 45 days from date of order; objection to service due one week from order. Proof of service due 60 days from date of order. Signed by Judge Joshua M. Kindred on 7/14/21. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
July 9, 2021 Filing 6 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by Municipality of Anchorage. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Weiss, Pamela)
July 8, 2021 Docket Annotation re #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File: Parties are advised that the motion and proposed order filed at docket #5 lists the wrong title of the court. Counsel to file a corrected motion and proposed order with the correct title for the District Court.(RMC, COURT STAFF)
July 6, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by Municipality of Anchorage. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Weiss, Pamela)
June 21, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Cases pursuant to L. Civ. R. 16.1(e) by Robert Anderson (LMH, COURT STAFF)
June 10, 2021 Filing 3 Unissued summons re Defendant MOA. (BJK, COURT STAFF)
June 10, 2021 Summons Issued as to Municipality of Anchorage. (BJK, COURT STAFF)
June 4, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
June 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Municipality of Anchorage (Filing fee $402/Receipt #ANC017965.), filed by Robert Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Table of Contents, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Municipality of Anchorage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Municipality of Anchorage
Represented By: Pamela D. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?