Stansberry et al v. Enter Federal Court Law Agency's et al
Plaintiff: Megan M Rowe, Natasha, Darryl, Alaska Bar Association and Lee Roy J. Stansberry
Defendant: Enter Federal Court Law Agency's, Dari R. Crosby, Timothy Burgess, Fleur L Roberts, FBI, DOJ Merrick Garlanc, FPD and Rex Butler
Case Number: 3:2021cv00146
Filed: June 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Ralph R Beistline
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2021 Filing 8 Returned/Undeliverable Mail addressed to Lee Roy J. Stansberry re #5 . Service for the NEF of the returned mail will not be redistributed to the addressee. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
July 26, 2021 Filing 7 Returned/Undeliverable Mail addressed to Lee Roy J Stansberry re #6 . Service for the NEF of the returned mail will not be redistributed to the addressee. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING DEFICIENT FILING: Mr. Stansberry must either pay the filing fee or file a Prisoners Application to Waive Prepayment of the Filing Fee by 8/20/2021. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 7/20/2021. (SDW, COURT STAFF)
July 12, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Hearing by Lee Roy J. Stansberry.(PXS, COURT STAFF)
June 23, 2021 Filing 4 Returned/Undeliverable Mail addressed to L. Stansberry re #2 . (LMH, COURT STAFF)
June 23, 2021 Filing 3 Returned/Undeliverable Mail addressed to L. Stansberry re #1 . (LMH, COURT STAFF)
June 16, 2021 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Habeus Corpus Misconduct Attorney Exoneration Injury Hearing against All Defendants, filed by Lee Roy J. Stansberry. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
June 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Request to Entry Habeus Corpus Exoneration Judgment Hearing against All Defendants, filed by Lee Roy J. Stansberry. (Attachments: #1 1 Letter)(PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stansberry et al v. Enter Federal Court Law Agency's et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan M Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natasha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darryl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alaska Bar Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Roy J. Stansberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enter Federal Court Law Agency's
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dari R. Crosby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Burgess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fleur L Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FBI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOJ Merrick Garlanc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FPD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rex Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?