Miller v. Knapp et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Miller
Defendant: Nancy Dalhstrom, John Fonstad, Thomas Elmore, David Knapp and Richard Fuller
Case Number: 3:2021cv00150
Filed: June 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Burgess
Referring Judge: Joshua M Kindred
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCREENING ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. First Amended Complaint or Notice of Dismissal due by 9/20/2021. Motion to Appointment Counsel due by 9/20/2021. Signed by Judge Joshua M. Kindred on 8/18/21. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
July 20, 2021 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE: The Nature of Suit for this case shall be changed from 440 to 550 to reflect that this is a prisoner civil rights action. The change is administrative in nature only. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
July 7, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Christopher Miller. (Attachments: #1 Account Statement)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
July 7, 2021 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
June 24, 2021 Filing 2 TMB TEXT ORDER OF RECUSAL: Judge Timothy M. Burgess hereby recuses himself from the above-referenced case. Pursuant to the system of random case assignments, this action is reassigned to Judge Joshua M. Kindred for all further proceedings. Please use the following case number on all future filings: 3:21-cv-00150-JMK. (JDS, COURT STAFF)
June 21, 2021 Filing 1 PRISONER'S COMPLAINT UNDER THE CIVIL RIGHTS ACT 42 U.S.C. 1983 "TORT" against Nancy Dalhstrom, Thomas Elmore, John Fonstad, Richard Fuller, David Knapp, filed by Christopher Miller.(LMH, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Knapp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Dalhstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Fonstad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Elmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Knapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?