The Downtown Soup Kitchen v. Municipality of Anchorage et al
Plaintiff: The Downtown Soup Kitchen doing business as Downtown Hope Center
Defendant: Anchorage Equal Rights Commission, Mitzi Bolanos Anderson and Municipality of Anchorage
Case Number: 3:2021cv00155
Filed: July 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SLG TEXT ORDER: The request for oral argument on the Motion for Preliminary Injunction (see Dkt. #15 ) is GRANTED. This telephonic hearing is scheduled for September 14, 2021 at 2:00 p.m. Each side shall have up to 20 minutes for argument at the hearing. All parties shall participate telephonically by dialing 877-402-9753 (use access code 6288202#) approximately five minutes before the scheduled hearing time. (CFR, CHAMBERS STAFF)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 REPLY to Response to Motion re #15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by The Downtown Soup Kitchen. (Tucker, Ryan)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Standing by Anchorage Equal Rights Commission, Mitzi Bolanos Anderson, Municipality of Anchorage. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Botstein, Ruth)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Anchorage Equal Rights Commission, Mitzi Bolanos Anderson, Municipality of Anchorage. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Botstein, Ruth)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to File Overlength Pleading by Anchorage Equal Rights Commission, Mitzi Bolanos Anderson, Municipality of Anchorage. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Botstein, Ruth)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SLG TEXT ORDER: Defendants unopposed Motion for 14-Day Extension of Time to File Answer at Docket #24 is GRANTED. The Answer shall be filed no later than August 23, 2021. (CFR, CHAMBERS STAFF)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (Unopposed) by Anchorage Equal Rights Commission, Mitzi Bolanos Anderson, Municipality of Anchorage. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Botstein, Ruth)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SLG TEXT ORDER: Defendants Motion for 14-Day Extension of Time to Oppose Motion for Preliminary Injunction at Docket #21 is GRANTED. The response may be filed no later than August 16, 2021. (CFR, CHAMBERS STAFF)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE by The Downtown Soup Kitchen re #21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Tucker, Ryan)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Anchorage Equal Rights Commission, Mitzi Bolanos Anderson, Municipality of Anchorage. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Botstein, Ruth)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS CO-COUNSEL by Anchorage Equal Rights Commission, Mitzi Bolanos Anderson, Municipality of Anchorage (Botstein, Ruth)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and accompanying documents, Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice, Motion for Preliminary Injunction and accompanying documents, Corporate Disclosure Statement, and Notice of Related Case served on Municipality of Anchorage on July 19, 2021, filed by The Downtown Soup Kitchen. (Galus, Jeremiah)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and accompanying documents, Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice, Motion for Preliminary Injunction and accompanying documents, Corporate Disclosure Statement, and Notice of Related Case served on Mitzi Bolanos Anderson on July 19, 2021, filed by The Downtown Soup Kitchen. (Galus, Jeremiah)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and accompanying documents, Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice, Motion for Preliminary Injunction and accompanying documents, Corporate Disclosure Statement, and Notice of Related Case served on Anchorage Equal Rights Commission on July 19, 2021, filed by The Downtown Soup Kitchen. (Galus, Jeremiah)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Notice to Counsel re #15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by The Downtown Soup Kitchen. A review of the document submitted at dkt 15 confirms that it is over 25 pages in length. If a CHAMBERS copy of the document has not been forwarded to the Court, counsel is reminded that, pursuant to D.Ak.LR 5.4 and the Administrative Policies and Procedures, you are required to provide the court with a CHAMBERS copy of your filing at dkt 15. The CHAMBERS copy must be attached to a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing and must be printed with the ECF pdf footer on each page. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by The Downtown Soup Kitchen. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Exhibit 1: AO 2021-30(S), #3 Exhibit 2: Assembly Memorandum, #4 Declaration of Sherrie Laurie, #5 Declaration of J.A., #6 Declaration of M.I., #7 Declaration of T.E., #8 Proposed Order)(Tucker, Ryan)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Related Case by The Downtown Soup Kitchen (Tucker, Ryan)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Downtown Soup Kitchen. (Tucker, Ryan)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE re #4 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David Andrew Cortman, at docket #4 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (RMC, COURT STAFF)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ADDITIONAL RELATED DOCUMENT Certificate of Good Standing by The Downtown Soup Kitchen re #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney David A. Cortman. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $250.00 paid. Receipt number 097--3097335.). (Tucker, Ryan)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE re #5 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jeremiah J.Galus, at docket #5 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (JLH, COURT STAFF)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Unissued summons re Defendant Anchorage Equal Rights Commission, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant Municipality of Anchorage, #2 Unissued Summons re Defendant M. Anderson)(LMH, COURT STAFF)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE re #6 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Katherine L. Anderson, at docket #6 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (JLH, COURT STAFF)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE re #3 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ryan J. Tucker, at docket #3 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (JLH, COURT STAFF)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Katherine L. Anderson. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $250.00 paid. Receipt number 097--3097352.) by The Downtown Soup Kitchen.(Tucker, Ryan)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Jeremiah J. Galus. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $250.00 paid. Receipt number 097--3097351.) by The Downtown Soup Kitchen.(Tucker, Ryan)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney David A. Cortman. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $250.00 paid. Receipt number 097--3097335.) by The Downtown Soup Kitchen.(Tucker, Ryan)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Ryan J. Tucker. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $250.00 paid. Receipt number 097--3097331.) by The Downtown Soup Kitchen.(Tucker, Ryan)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Tucker, Ryan)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 097--3097294.), filed by The Downtown Soup Kitchen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Tucker, Ryan)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Summons Issued as to Anchorage Equal Rights Commission, Mitzi Bolanos Anderson, Municipality of Anchorage. (LMH, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Downtown Soup Kitchen v. Municipality of Anchorage et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anchorage Equal Rights Commission
Represented By: Meagan Rae Carmichael
Represented By: Ruth Botstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitzi Bolanos Anderson
Represented By: Meagan Rae Carmichael
Represented By: Ruth Botstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Municipality of Anchorage
Represented By: Meagan Rae Carmichael
Represented By: Ruth Botstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Downtown Soup Kitchen doing business as Downtown Hope Center
Represented By: Katherine L. Anderson
Represented By: David Andrew Cortman
Represented By: Ryan Jeffrey Tucker
Represented By: Sonja Kathleen Redmond
Represented By: Jeremiah J. Galus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?