United States of America v. Long
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: William J. Long
Case Number: 3:2021cv00156
Filed: July 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: John W Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 49 U.S.C. ยง 1471
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2021 Filing 19 JWS TEXT ORDER: The parties' stipulation at docket #17 for dismissal with prejudice with each party to bear such party's own costs and fees is effective without a court order. Fed R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). The Clerk will please close this case. (LLR, CHAMBERS STAFF)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATED ORDER FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 8/10/21. (LLR, CHAMBERS STAFF)
August 9, 2021 Filing 17 Joint MOTION for Entry of Stipulated Order for Permanent Injunction by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Stipulated order for permanent injunction)(Fonstad, John)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Responses due by 8/6/2021. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 8/4/21. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
August 3, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Second Unopposed Request to Extend time to File Opposition to Unites States' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by William J. Long. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Second Unopposed Request to Extend time to File Opposition to Unites States' Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Robinson, Jeffrey)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response. Response as to #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction due by 7/30/2021. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 7/21/21. (LLR, CHAMBERS STAFF)
July 20, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Expedited) Unopposed Request to Extend Time to File Opposition to United States' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by William J. Long. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Unopposed Request to Extend Time to File Opposition to United States' Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Robinson, Jeffrey)
July 9, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Service by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Return of Service Affidavit)(Fonstad, John)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RE MOTION TO DISMISS: Advising counsel of the procedure to follow prior to filing a motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 7/8/21. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
July 6, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey William Robinson on behalf of William J. Long (Robinson, Jeffrey)
July 2, 2021 Summons Issued as to William J. Long. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
July 2, 2021 Filing 9 DECLARATION of Dan Dahl re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by United States of America. (Fonstad, John)
July 2, 2021 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Alan H. McHone re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Fonstad, John)
July 2, 2021 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Paula Huckleberry re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by United States of America. (Fonstad, John)
July 2, 2021 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Melissa A. Long re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by United States of America. (Fonstad, John)
July 2, 2021 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Thomas Palmer re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Fonstad, John)
July 2, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order)(Fonstad, John)
July 2, 2021 Filing 3 Unissued summons re Defendant William J. Long, (LMH, COURT STAFF)
July 2, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet (LMH, COURT STAFF)
July 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief against William J. Long, filed by United States of America.(LMH, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William J. Long
Represented By: Jeffrey William Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: John A. Fonstad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?