Stansberry v. State of Alaska et al
Petitioner: Leroy J. Stansberry
Respondent: State of Alaska, Court Judge OPA, Mike Dunleavy and Arnaldo Hernandez
Case Number: 3:2021cv00182
Filed: July 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: James K Singleton
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2021 Filing 6 Returned/Undeliverable Mail addressed to Leroy J. Stansberry re #4 , #5 . Service of the NEF for the returned mail entry will not be distributed to the addressee. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
September 3, 2021 Filing 5 JUDGMENT: The Petition under 28 U.S.C. 2254 for Writ of Habeas Corpus is DISMISSED without prejudice. The Court declines to issue a Certificate of Appealability. Any further request for a Certificate of Appealability must be addressed to the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals. Signed by Judge James K. Singleton, Jr on 9/3/2021. (SDW, COURT STAFF)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Petition under 28 U.S.C. 2254 for Writ of Habeas Corpus is DISMISSED without prejudice. All pending motions are DENIED as moot. The Clerk of Court shall enter judgment in this case accordingly.The Court declines to issue a Certificate of Appealability. Any further request for a Certificate of Appealability must be addressed to the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals. See Order for details. Signed by Judge James K. Singleton, Jr on 9/3/2021. (SDW, COURT STAFF)
September 3, 2021 Docket Annotation: Arnaldo Hernandez, Superintendent, Anchorage Correctional Complex substituted for State of Alaska, Court Judge OPA and Mike Dunleavy pursuant to FRCvP 25(d). (SDW, COURT STAFF)
August 5, 2021 Filing 3 Returned/Undeliverable Mail addressed to Leroy J. Stansberry re #2 , #1 . Service for the returned mail will not be redistributed to the addressee. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
July 30, 2021 Filing 2 Docket Annotation: Your habeas action at docket number #1 is deficient because you did not pay the $5.00 filing fee and you did not file an Application to Waive Prepayment of the Filing Fee. Please correct the deficiency/deficiencies noted above by submitting the $5.00 filing fee OR a fully completed and signed Application to Waive Prepayment of the Filing Fee. A blank copy of this Courts Form PS10 is attached. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
July 27, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus 28:2254, filed by Leroy J. Stansberry. (Attachments: #1 1, #2 2)(PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stansberry v. State of Alaska et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Leroy J. Stansberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Alaska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Court Judge OPA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mike Dunleavy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Arnaldo Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?