Flenaugh v. Kantor et al
Plaintiff: Tiffany Jamil Flenaugh
Defendant: Azaria K. Kantor and Alexandria Conaway
Case Number: 3:2021cv00193
Filed: August 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Ralph R Beistline
Referring Judge: Timothy M Burgess
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RE: DEFICIENT FILING & CASE SCREENING: Filing fee or Application to waive due by 10/25/2021. Amended complaint or notice of dismissal due by 10/25/21. Signed by Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 9/22/21. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
September 1, 2021 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE: The Nature of Suit is changed from 440 to 550 to reflect this civil rights action is filed by a prisoner. This change is administrative in nature only. (SDW, COURT STAFF)
August 24, 2021 Filing 3 TMB TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. By agreement of the judges, the above referenced case is hereby reassigned to the Honorable Ralph R. Beistline for all further proceedings. Please use the following case number on all future filings: 3:21-cv-00193-RRB. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
August 18, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
August 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alexandria Conaway, Azaria K. Kantor, filed by Tiffany Jamil Flenaugh. (Attachments: #1 Account Statememt, #2 USPO Memo to the Court, #3 USPO Memo to the Court, #4 USPO Pretrial Services Report, #5 Transcripts of Change of Plea/Bail Review)(PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flenaugh v. Kantor et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Jamil Flenaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Azaria K. Kantor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexandria Conaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?