Alfred v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Arnold Alfred
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2021cv00266
Filed: December 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: H Russel Holland
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2671
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Unopposed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fonstad, John)
January 24, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Arnold Alfred. United States of America served on 12/23/2021, answer due 2/22/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Wilson, Whitney)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re Notice to Counsel. Plaintiff shall either file proof of service or status report within seven days. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
December 22, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Service by Arnold Alfred (Wilson, Whitney)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER RE MOTIONS TO DISMISS: Advising counsel of the procedure to follow prior to filing a motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 12/22/21. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
December 8, 2021 Filing 3 Unissued summons re Defendant U.S. Attorney, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant U.S. Attorney General)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
December 8, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Wilson, Whitney)
December 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 097--3174015.), filed by Arnold Alfred.(Wilson, Whitney)
December 8, 2021 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alfred v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arnold Alfred
Represented By: Whitney Power Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: John A. Fonstad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?