Fanene v. State of Alaska, Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Masae Fanene
Defendant: State of Alaska, Department of Corrections, Jane Doe, Municipality of Anchorage, Garrett B. Kline, Kyle Haskins and Hannah Sears
Case Number: 3:2022cv00018
Filed: January 31, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: H Russel Holland
Referring Judge: Joshua M Kindred
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE of Unavailability of Counsel by State of Alaska, Department of Corrections (Goodnight, Brittany)
March 24, 2022 Filing 19 Witness List by Kyle Haskins, Garrett B. Kline, Municipality of Anchorage, Hannah Sears. (Johnson, Linda)
March 24, 2022 Filing 18 Witness List by Masae Fanene. (Fannon, Joshua)
March 24, 2022 Filing 17 Witness List by State of Alaska, Department of Corrections. (Goodnight, Brittany)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Governing Use and Production of Confidential Materials. Signed by Judge Joshua M. Kindred on 3/3/22. (LLR, CHAMBERS STAFF)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Fact Discovery closes 2/24/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 4/21/2023. See Order for additional deadlines. Signed by Judge Joshua M. Kindred on 2/25/22. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
February 24, 2022 Filing 14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Goodnight, Brittany)
February 24, 2022 Filing 13 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by State of Alaska, Department of Corrections. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Goodnight, Brittany)
February 17, 2022 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by Municipality of Anchorage.(Johnson, Linda)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RE INITIAL SCHEDULING & PLANNING CONFERENCE REPORT: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 21 days of service of this order. Signed by Judge Joshua M. Kindred on 2/10/22. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
February 7, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by State of Alaska, Department of Corrections. (Goodnight, Brittany)
February 7, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by Kyle Haskins, Garrett B. Kline, Municipality of Anchorage, Hannah Sears (Attachments: #1 Attachments)(Johnson, Linda)
February 7, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by Kyle Haskins, Garrett B. Kline, Hannah Sears (Johnson, Linda)
February 7, 2022 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Kyle Haskins, Garrett B. Kline, Hannah Sears.(Johnson, Linda)
February 2, 2022 Filing 6 JWS TEXT ORDER: The assigned judge recuses from presiding in this case. This case has been reassigned by random draw to Hon. Joshua M. Kindred. Henceforth, the case number will be 3:22-cv-00018-JMK. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
February 1, 2022 Filing 5 JUDGE HOLLAND TEXT ORDER: Pursuant to the system of random case assignments, his action is hereby reassigned to Honorable John W. Sedwick for all further proceedings. Please use the following case number on all future filings: 3:22-cv-00018-JWS. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
January 31, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Consent to Removal by State of Alaska, Department of Corrections (Goodnight, Brittany)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
January 31, 2022 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
January 31, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Kyle Haskins, Garrett B. Kline from Superior Court, Third Judicial District, State of Alaska, case number 3AN-21-09048CI. ( Filing fee $402/Receipt #ANC018674), filed by Kyle Haskins, Garrett B. Kline. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fanene v. State of Alaska, Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Masae Fanene
Represented By: Joshua F. Fannon
Represented By: Myron E. Angstman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Alaska, Department of Corrections
Represented By: Brittany Ann Goodnight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Municipality of Anchorage
Represented By: Linda J. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garrett B. Kline
Represented By: Linda J. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle Haskins
Represented By: Linda J. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hannah Sears
Represented By: Linda J. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?