Smith v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Scott W. Smith
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2022cv00074
Filed: April 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2022 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Colbo, Kimberlee)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Fact Discovery closes 3/9/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 5/26/2023. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 5/2/22. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
April 27, 2022 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Colbo, Kimberlee)
April 18, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Colbo, Kimberlee)
April 18, 2022 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Colbo, Kimberlee)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RE INITIAL SCHEDULING & PLANNING CONFERENCE REPORT: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 21 days of service of this order. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 4/6/22. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
April 5, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Colbo, Kimberlee)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
April 4, 2022 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Colbo, Kimberlee)
April 4, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company from Superior Court for the State of Alaska at Anchorage, case number 3AN-22-04764CI. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AAKDC-3231642), filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Colbo, Kimberlee)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott W. Smith
Represented By: Robert D. Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Kimberlee A. Colbo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?