Nicolia v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Teresa Nicolia
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2022cv00169
Filed: July 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Change Venue. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 8/26/22. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re #9 Stipulation to Bifurcate Trial. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 8/23/22. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Fact Discovery completed by 6/9/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 9/15/2023. See order for additional deadlines. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 8/23/22. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
August 9, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit)(Colbo, Kimberlee)
August 9, 2022 Filing 11 Notice to Counsel re #10 First MOTION to Change Venue filed by Teresa Nicolia. A review of the document submitted at dkt 10 confirms that it is over 25 pages in length. If a CHAMBERS copy of the document has not been forwarded to the Court, counsel is reminded that, pursuant to D.Ak.LR 5.4 and the Administrative Policies and Procedures, you are required to provide the court with a CHAMBERS copy of your filing at dkt 10. The CHAMBERS copy must be attached to a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing and must be printed with the ECF pdf footer on each page. (JDS, COURT STAFF)
August 8, 2022 Filing 10 First MOTION to Change Venue by Teresa Nicolia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Ringstad, Kenneth)
August 5, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION to Bifurcate Stipulation to a Bifurcated Trial by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Colbo, Kimberlee)
August 5, 2022 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Colbo, Kimberlee)
August 1, 2022 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Colbo, Kimberlee)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RE INITIAL SCHEDULING & PLANNING CONFERENCE REPORT: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 21 days of service of this order. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 7/21/22. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
July 21, 2022 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Colbo, Kimberlee)
July 21, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Colbo, Kimberlee)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
July 20, 2022 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Colbo, Kimberlee)
July 20, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company from Superior Court for the State of Alaska Fourth Judicial District at Fairbanks, case number 4FA-22-01660CI. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AAKDC-3285805), filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Removal filed in Fairbanks Superior Court)(Colbo, Kimberlee)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nicolia v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Nicolia
Represented By: Kenneth P. Ringstad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Kimberlee A. Colbo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?