Emrit v. Musk et al
Plaintiff: Ronald Satish Emrit Presidential Candidate Number P60005535 "also known as" (aka) Ronald Satish Emrit, & Presidential Committee/Political Action Committee/Separate Segregated Fund (SSF) Number C00569897 d/b/a United States of Emrits
Defendant: Elon Musk, Vivek Ramaswamy, Department of Government Efficiency and Mike Johnson
Case Number: 3:2025cv00007
Filed: January 13, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Ralph R Beistline
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: No cause code entered
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2025 Filing 5 SLG TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: By agreement of the judges, the above referenced case is hereby reassigned to the Honorable Ralph R. Beistline for all further proceedings. Please use the following case number on all future filings: 3:25-cv-00007-RRB. (SCD, COURT STAFF)
February 7, 2025 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Ronald Satish Emrit. Filing fee $605/Not Paid. (PXS, COURT STAFF) Modified on 2/10/2025 to reflect date filed (PXS, COURT STAFF).
January 13, 2025 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ronald Satish Emrit.(PXS, COURT STAFF)
January 13, 2025 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
January 13, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Department of Government Efficiency, Mike Johnson, Elon Musk, Vivek Ramaswamy, filed by Ronald Satish Emrit.(PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Emrit v. Musk et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elon Musk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vivek Ramaswamy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Government Efficiency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Satish Emrit Presidential Candidate Number P60005535 "also known as" (aka) Ronald Satish Emrit, & Presidential Committee/Political Action Committee/Separate Segregated Fund (SSF) Number C00569897 d/b/a United States of Emrits
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?