Huntsman v. Hummel
Plaintiff: Lily Huntsman
Defendant: Officer Tyler J Hummel
Case Number: 3:2025cv00036
Filed: February 18, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING A SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 5/9/2025 at 11:30 a.m. before Sharon L. Gleason. All parties shall participate telephonically by dialing 571-353-2301 (Call ID 020262828, Pin 487051) approximately five minutes before the scheduled hearing time. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 4/8/2025. (ANM, COURT STAFF)
April 7, 2025 Filing 14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Johnson, Linda)
April 4, 2025 Filing 13 MOTION Request to Appear by Telephone by Lily Huntsman. (Attachments: #1 1)(PXS, COURT STAFF) Modified on 4/7/2025 to reflect date filed (PXS, COURT STAFF).
April 4, 2025 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (PXS, COURT STAFF) Modified on 4/7/2025 to reflect date filed (PXS, COURT STAFF).
April 4, 2025 Filing 11 Plaintiff's Witness List by Lily Huntsman. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
April 4, 2025 Filing 10 NOTICE of Change of Address by Lily Huntsman. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
March 18, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE INITIAL SCHEDULING & PLANNING CONFERENCE REPORT: Counsel for defendant shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 21 days of service of this order. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 3/18/2025. (SCD, COURT STAFF)
March 5, 2025 Filing 8 NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by Tyler J Hummel (Johnson, Linda)
March 4, 2025 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Tyler J Hummel.(Johnson, Linda)
February 24, 2025 Filing 6 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Tyler J Hummel. (Johnson, Linda)
February 19, 2025 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by Tyler J Hummel (Johnson, Linda)
February 19, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (JDV, COURT STAFF)
February 19, 2025 Filing 3 Clerks Notice: Pursuant to the system of random case assignment, this case has been assigned to the Honorable Chief District Judge Sharon L. Gleason. Please use the following case number for all future filings 3:25-cv-00036-SLG. (JDV, COURT STAFF)
February 19, 2025 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Johnson, Linda)
February 19, 2025 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Tyler J Hummel from Alaska Superior Court, case number 3AN-25-04097CI. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AAKDC-3737200), filed by Tyler J Hummel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Johnson, Linda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huntsman v. Hummel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lily Huntsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Tyler J Hummel
Represented By: Linda J. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?