Wayson v. Rundell

Case Number: 4:2006cv00001
Filed: January 18, 2006
Court: Alaska District Court
Office: Fairbanks Office
Presiding Judge: John W. Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 24, 2008 95 Opinion or Order of the Court Order on Motion to Compel
February 7, 2008 91 Opinion or Order of the Court Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
August 6, 2007 61 Opinion or Order of the Court Order on Motion to Compel
July 27, 2007 58 Opinion or Order of the Court Order on Motion to Remand to State Court
December 4, 2006 37 Opinion or Order of the Court Order on Motion to Dismiss
September 15, 2006 29 Opinion or Order of the Court Order on Motion to Dismiss
May 15, 2006 21 Opinion or Order of the Court Order on Motion for Hearing, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion to Dismiss

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wayson v. Rundell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?