Pain Solutions, LLC et al v. Board of Trustees of the Alaska Pipetrades Association - UA Local 375 Health and Security Trust

Plaintiff: Midtown Pain Management and Pain Solutions, LLC
Defendant: Board of Trustees of the Alaska Pipetraders Association - UA Local 375 Health and Security Trust and Board of Trustees of the Alaska Pipetrades Association - UA Local 375 Health and Security Trust
Case Number: 4:2017cv00013
Filed: May 15, 2017
Court: Alaska District Court
Office: Fairbanks Office
County: Fairbanks
Presiding Judge: H Russel Holland
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order 21 ORDER DISMISSING CASE: This matter is dismissed with prejudice, the parties to bear their respective costs and attorney fees. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 9/28/17. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
September 27, 2017 20 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Midtown Pain Management, Pain Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Satterberg, William)
September 27, 2017 19 CLERK'S NOTICE re #14 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Noelle Elyce Dwarzski, at docket #14 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (JLH, COURT STAFF)
September 11, 2017 18 NOTICE of Filing Administrative Record by Board of Trustees of the Alaska Pipetrades Association - UA Local 375 Health and Security Trust (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(Morales, Frank)
September 8, 2017 17 DECLARATION of Noelle Dwarzski re #15 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Board of Trustees of the Alaska Pipetrades Association - UA Local 375 Health and Security Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Morales, Frank)
September 8, 2017 16 DECLARATION of Heidi Campbell re #15 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Board of Trustees of the Alaska Pipetrades Association - UA Local 375 Health and Security Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A1, #2 Exhibit A2, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Morales, Frank)
September 8, 2017 15 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Board of Trustees of the Alaska Pipetrades Association - UA Local 375 Health and Security Trust. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Morales, Frank)
September 7, 2017 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Noelle Elyce Dwarzski. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2387395.) by Board of Trustees of the Alaska Pipetrades Association - UA Local 375 Health and Security Trust. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Dwarzski, Noelle)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order 13 SCHEDULING ORDER re Review of Denial of ERISA Benefits. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 7/12/17. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
July 10, 2017 12 ANSWER to Complaint by Board of Trustees of the Alaska Pipetrades Association - UA Local 375 Health and Security Trust.(Morales, Frank)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order 11 ORDER re Answer: No Answer has been filed on behalf of the defendant. Answer due 7/14/17. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order 10 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Change Case Caption. The caption of this case is amended to designate the Board of Trustees of the Alaska Pipetrades Association - UA Local 375 Heath and Security Trust, the defendant in this action. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 6/16/17. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
June 6, 2017 9 RESPONSE TO ORDER at Dkt. 7 by Aetna Health & Life Insurance Company. (Morales, Frank) Modified on 6/15/2017 to link to dkt 4 (JLH, COURT STAFF).
June 6, 2017 8 NOTICE of Filing State Court Pleadings by Aetna Health & Life Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Morales, Frank)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order 7 ORDER directing counsel to clarify the motion to change case caption by June 9, 2017. (BJK, COURT STAFF)
May 31, 2017 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Kate Welch on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Welch, Amy)
May 30, 2017 5 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by All Defendants (Morales, Frank)
May 30, 2017 4 MOTION Change Case Caption by Aetna Health & Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Morales, Frank)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order 3 ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days.(LMH, COURT STAFF)
May 17, 2017 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Morales, Frank)
May 15, 2017 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Board of Trustees of the Alaska Pipetraders Association - UA Local 375 Health and Security Trust from District Court - Fourth Judicial District at Fairbanks, case number 4FA-17-01706 CI. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2333005), filed by Board of Trustees of the Alaska Pipetraders Association - UA Local 375 Health and Security Trust. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Notice of Removal)(Morales, Frank)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pain Solutions, LLC et al v. Board of Trustees of the Alaska Pipetrades Association - UA Local 375 Health and Security Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Midtown Pain Management
Represented By: Amy Kate Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pain Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Amy Kate Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Trustees of the Alaska Pipetraders Association - UA Local 375 Health and Security Trust
Represented By: Frank Joseph Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Trustees of the Alaska Pipetrades Association - UA Local 375 Health and Security Trust
Represented By: Noelle Elyce Dwarzski
Represented By: Frank Joseph Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?