Parks v. Lupinskas

Plaintiff: Edward Vernon Parks, Jr.
Defendant: William Lupinskas
Case Number: 4:2018cv00032
Filed: September 10, 2018
Court: Alaska District Court
0 Judge: Timothy M Burgess
1 Judge: James K Singleton
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 30, 2018 5 Featured Case ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Show Cause Response or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal due by 12/3/2018. The Court will not address the Motion for Appointment of Counsel, at docket #2 , until compliance with this Order. Signed by Judge James K. Singleton, Jr on 10/30/18. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
October 26, 2018 4 TMB TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. By agreement of the judges, the above referenced case is hereby reassigned to the Honorable Senior Judge James K. Singleton for all further proceedings. Please use the following case number on all future filings: 4:18-cv-00032-JKS. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
September 10, 2018 3 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - CJA 23 by Edward Vernon Parks, Jr. (PXS, COURT STAFF) Modified on 9/11/2018 to create relationship to document #2 (PXS, COURT STAFF).
September 10, 2018 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Edward Vernon Parks, Jr.(PXS, COURT STAFF)
September 10, 2018 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus 28:2254 (Filing fee $5/Receipt #ANC014858.), filed by Edward Vernon Parks, Jr.(PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parks v. Lupinskas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Lupinskas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Vernon Parks, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?