Association of Village Council Presidents v. Newhouse & Vogler et al
Plaintiff: Association of Village Council Presidents
Defendant: Joseph Lee Newhouse, James Robert Newhouse, Newhouse & Vogler and Stephen Robert Vogler
Case Number: 4:2019cv00002
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Burgess
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2019 Filing 11 TMB TEXT ORDER GRANTING #10 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #9 Motion to Remand to State Court and for Attorney Fees and Costs. Defendants' response to Plaintiff's Motion at docket #9 is due on or before 3/15/2019. (NMG, CHAMBERS STAFF)
March 1, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court AND FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS [Motion for Extension of Time is Unopposed] by James Robert Newhouse, Joseph Lee Newhouse, Newhouse & Vogler, Stephen Robert Vogler. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sandone, Megan)
February 15, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand to State Court AND FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS by Association of Village Council Presidents. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Neeleman, John)
January 30, 2019 Filing 8 TMB TEXT ORDER GRANTING #5 UnopposedMotion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Upon agreement of the parties, Defendants shall file an answer to the plaintiff's complaint on or before March 15, 2019.(NMG, CHAMBERS STAFF)
January 22, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Newhouse & Vogler. (Sandone, Megan)
January 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Sandone, Megan)
January 17, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Unopposed by James Robert Newhouse, Joseph Lee Newhouse, Newhouse & Vogler, Stephen Robert Vogler. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sandone, Megan)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by All Defendants (Wuestenfeld, William)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Wuestenfeld, William)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Superior Court for State of Alaska Fourth Judicial District at Bethel, case number 4BE-18-00459CI. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2634750), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Wuestenfeld, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Association of Village Council Presidents v. Newhouse & Vogler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Lee Newhouse
Represented By: William M. Wuestenfeld
Represented By: Megan N. Sandone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Robert Newhouse
Represented By: William M. Wuestenfeld
Represented By: Megan N. Sandone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newhouse & Vogler
Represented By: William M. Wuestenfeld
Represented By: Megan N. Sandone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Robert Vogler
Represented By: William M. Wuestenfeld
Represented By: Megan N. Sandone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Association of Village Council Presidents
Represented By: John R. Neeleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?