Hoover v. Lowe's Companies, Inc.
Plaintiff: Dana Hoover
Defendant: Lowe's Companies, Inc. and Lowe's Companies, Inc. doing business as Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00017
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: John W Sedwick
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Poulos, John)
July 8, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lowe's Companies, Inc.. (Poulos, John)
June 12, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by Lowe's Companies, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Plaintiff's Request for Jury Trial, #3 Exhibit 3 - Plaintiff's Entry of Appearance, #4 Exhibit 4 - Summons & Notice to Both Parties of Judicial Assignment, #5 Exhibit 5 - Defendant's Notice to State Court of Removal of Action to Federal Court)(Poulos, John)
June 11, 2019 Filing 8 INITIAL CASE STATUS REPORT/CASE SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 28 days of service of this order. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE MOTIONS TO DISMISS: Advising counsel of the procedure to follow prior to filing a motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 6/11/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
June 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by Lowe's Companies, Inc. (Poulos, John)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
May 29, 2019 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Lowe's Companies, Inc.. (Poulos, John)
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Lowe's Companies, Inc..(Poulos, John)
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Poulos, John)
May 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lowe's Companies, Inc. from Alaska Superior Court, Fairbanks, case number 4FA-19-01883 CI. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2706251), filed by Lowe's Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Notice to State Court, #3 Exhibit C - Notice to Adverse Party)(Poulos, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoover v. Lowe's Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Companies, Inc.
Represented By: John S. Poulos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Companies, Inc. doing business as Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Represented By: John S. Poulos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Hoover
Represented By: Sandra Rofle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?