James v. James et al
Plaintiff: Samson Eugene James
Defendant: R. Kelly, Benns and Frank James
Case Number: 4:2019cv00020
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH LEAVE TO AMEND: The Complaint, at Docket #1 is DISMISSED without prejudice. First Amended Complaint/Notice of Dismissal due by 10/5/2019. The Application to Waive the Filing Fee at Docket #3 is deferred until Mr. James fully complies with this Order. (See Order for details). Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 09/30/2019. (CME, COURT STAFF)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Change of Address by Samson Eugene James. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Samson Eugene James. (Attachments: #1 Account Statement)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Benns, Frank James, R. Kelly, filed by Samson Eugene James. (Attachments: #1 1, #2 2)(PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James v. James et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samson Eugene James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?