Horschel v. Bernhardt
Plaintiff: Esther Horschel
Defendant: David Bernhardt
Case Number: 4:2019cv00022
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: H Russel Holland
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting Unopposed Motion to File Fourth Amended Complaint and Consolidate Cases filed in 4:18-cv-0006-HRH at docket 40 . Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 8/8/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
July 26, 2019 Filing 4 Unissued summons re Defendant D. Bernhardt. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
July 26, 2019 Summons Issued as to David Bernhardt. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet. (Sparks, Robert)
July 18, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Sparks, Robert)
July 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against David Bernhardt ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number FBK001782.), filed by Esther Horschel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit OFO Decision)(Sparks, Robert) Modified on 7/22/2019 to enter correct receipt number (LMH, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Horschel v. Bernhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Bernhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esther Horschel
Represented By: Robert A. Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?