Bowers v. CSG Inc. Law Firm et al
Plaintiff: Gerald L. Bowers
Defendant: Jane Kauvar, CSG Inc. Law Firm, Richard Lottmann, Joe Kuchle, Danielle Gardner, Upper Tanana Development Corporation, Jeff Cheavens, The Alaska Court System, Ben Seekins, Thomas Temple, Zane Wilson and Mary Shogry
Case Number: 4:2019cv00025
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Burgess
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Clarification of Order Denying Motion for Reconsideration re #17 Order on Motion for Reconsideration by Gerald L. Bowers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(LMH, COURT STAFF)
September 30, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE TO THE COURT by Gerald L. Bowers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(LMH, COURT STAFF)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying #15 Motion for Reconsideration (RMC, COURT STAFF)
September 17, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE to the Court by Gerald L. Bowers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(LMH, COURT STAFF)
September 16, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Reconsideration of Order For Dismissal re #13 by Gerald L. Bowers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(LMH, COURT STAFF)
September 10, 2019 Filing 14 JUDGMENT: case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Timothy M. Burgess on 9/10/19. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF DISMISSAL; case is dismissed with prejudice. All motions are denied as moot #5 , #11 . Signed by Judge Timothy M. Burgess on 9/10/19. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
September 9, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE TO THE FEDERAL COURT REGARDING SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT by Gerald L. Bowers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(LMH, COURT STAFF)
August 30, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Allow Plantiff Right of Redemption for Property Sold at Foreclosure Auction by Gerald L. Bowers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(LMH, COURT STAFF)
August 28, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE to the Federal Court Regarding Foreclosure Sale and Notice to Quit by Gerald L. Bowers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(LMH, COURT STAFF)
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Stay Foreclosure Sale of 791 Eton Boulevard filed by CSG Inc. Law Firm. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Wilson, Zane)
August 23, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by Gerald L. Bowers (LMH, COURT STAFF)
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) VOLUME 2 OF 2 by Gerald L. Bowers (Attachments: #1 E-31, #2 G-33, #3 H-34, #4 I-35, #5 J-36, #6 L-38, #7 M-39, #8 O-41, #9 R-44, #10 S-45, #11 T-46, #12 U-47, #13 V-48, #14 W-49, #15 X-50, #16 Y-51, #17 Z-52, #18 A-53, #19 B-54, #20 C-55, #21 D-56, #22 E-57, #23 F-58, #24 G59, #25 H-60, #26 J-62, #27 K-63)(LMH, COURT STAFF)
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S)VOLUME 1 OF 2 by Gerald L. Bowers (Attachments: #1 A-1, #2 B-2, #3 C-3, #4 D-4, #5 E-5, #6 F-6, #7 G-7, #8 H-8, #9 I-9, #10 K-10, #11 L-11, #12 M-12, #13 N-13, #14 O-14, #15 P-15, #16 Q-16, #17 R-17, #18 S-18, #19 T-19, #20 U-20, #21 W-21, #22 X-22, #23 Y-23, #24 Z-26, #25 A-27, #26 B-28, #27 C-29, #28 D-30)(LMH, COURT STAFF)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Stay Foreclosure Sale of 791 Eton Boulevard by Gerald L. Bowers.(LMH, COURT STAFF)
August 12, 2019 Summons Issued as to CSG Inc. Law Firm, Jeff Cheavens, Danielle Gardner, Jane Kauvar, Joe Kuchle, Richard Lottmann, Ben Seekins, Mary Shogry, Thomas Temple, The Alaska Court System, Upper Tanana Development Corporation, and Zane Wilson. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 Unissued summons re Defendant CSG, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant Z. Wilson, #2 Unissued Summons re Defendant D. Gardner, #3 Unissued Summons re Defendant J. Kuchle, #4 Criminal Cover Sheet re Defendant N. Rallo, #5 Unissued Summons re Defendant Alaska Court System, #6 Unissued Summons re Defendant J. Kauvar, #7 Unissued Summons re Defendant T. Temple, #8 Unissued Summons re Defendant B. Seekins, #9 Unissued Summons re Defendant R. Lottmann, #10 Unissued Summons re Defendant J. Cheavens, #11 Unissued Summons re Defendant M. Shogry)(LMH, COURT STAFF)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CSG Inc. Law Firm, Jeff Cheavens, Danielle Gardner, Jane Kauvar, Joe Kuchle, Richard Lottmann, Ben Seekins, Mary Shogry, Thomas Temple, The Alaska Court System, Upper Tanana Development Corporation, Zane Wilson (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt #097951.), filed by Gerald L. Bowers. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(LMH, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowers v. CSG Inc. Law Firm et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Kauvar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSG Inc. Law Firm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Lottmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Kuchle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danielle Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Upper Tanana Development Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Cheavens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Alaska Court System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Seekins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Temple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zane Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Shogry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald L. Bowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?