K'OYITL'OTS'INA, LTD v. Gottschalk et al
Plaintiff: K'OYITL'OTS'INA, LTD
Defendant: Robert Gottschalk and Global Food Services LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00030
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: John W Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
October 31, 2019 Filing 32 DECLARATION of Howard Anastasi re #31 Response in Opposition to Motion, by K'OYITL'OTS'INA, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hansen, Steven)
October 31, 2019 Filing 31 RESPONSE in Opposition re #25 MOTION to Strike #20 MOTION to Dismiss OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE filed by K'OYITL'OTS'INA, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hansen, Steven) Modified on 11/7/2019 to link to dkt 20 (JLH, COURT STAFF).
October 30, 2019 Filing 30 ADDITIONAL RELATED DOCUMENT Certificate of Good Standing of Attorney Robert W. Ottinger by Robert Gottschalk re #18 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Robert Ottinger, #19 Declaration. (Ottinger, Robert)
October 14, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Global Food Services LLC d/b/a GFS GROUP by K'OYITL'OTS'INA, LTD (Hansen, Steven)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER re Case Status. Plaintiff's motion to strike #25 is denied. Plaintiff's application for entry of default as to defendant Gottschalk #23 is denied. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 10/11/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
October 11, 2019 Filing 27 Receipt of 150.00 non-resident attorney payment for Robert Walter Ottinger as to Defendant Robert Gottschalk. re #18 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Robert Ottinger (PXS, COURT STAFF)
October 10, 2019 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM Motion to Strike Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or Int he Alternative, Motion to Transfer Venue; Motion to Issue Preliminary Injunction Preli by K'OYITL'OTS'INA, LTD #25 MOTION to Strike #20 MOTION to Dismiss OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE filed by K'OYITL'OTS'INA, LTD. (Hansen, Steven)
October 10, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION to Strike #20 MOTION to Dismiss OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE by K'OYITL'OTS'INA, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hansen, Steven)
October 10, 2019 Filing 24 ADDITIONAL RELATED DOCUMENT Entry of Default by K'OYITL'OTS'INA, LTD re #23 First MOTION for Entry of Default . (Hansen, Steven)
October 10, 2019 Filing 23 First MOTION for Entry of Default by K'OYITL'OTS'INA, LTD.(Hansen, Steven)
October 10, 2019 Filing 22 DECLARATION of ROBERT GOTTSCHALK IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1404 re #20 MOTION to Dismiss OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE, #21 Memorandum, by Robert Gottschalk. (Ottinger, Robert)
October 10, 2019 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE by Robert Gottschalk #20 MOTION to Dismiss OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE filed by Robert Gottschalk. (Ottinger, Robert)
October 10, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE by Robert Gottschalk. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE)(Ottinger, Robert)
October 10, 2019 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Robert Ottinger re #18 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Robert Ottinger by Robert Gottschalk. (Ottinger, Robert)
October 10, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Robert Ottinger by Robert Gottschalk. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING NON-ELIGIBLE ATTORNEY FOR PERMISSION TO APPEAR AND PARTICIPATE IN THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF ALASKA)(Ottinger, Robert)
October 1, 2019 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Global Food Services LLC by K'OYITL'OTS'INA, LTD. (Hansen, Steven)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re Notice to Counsel. Plaintiff shall either file proof of service by seven days from the entry of this order or file a status report concerning service of the complaint on defendant Global Food Services. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
September 19, 2019 Filing 15 ERRATA to Motion for Preliminary Injunction by K'OYITL'OTS'INA, LTD #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by K'OYITL'OTS'INA, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-5 to Memorandum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Hansen, Steven)
September 19, 2019 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint,Demand Jury Trial, Motion Application for Non-Eligible Attorney, Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Memorandum, Exhibits, Proposed Order, Civil Cover Sheet served on Robert Gottschalk on 9/17/2019 at 11:38 am EDT, filed by K'OYITL'OTS'INA, LTD. (Hansen, Steven)
September 19, 2019 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE re #6 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Natalie Rainforth Poteet, at docket #6 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (JLH, COURT STAFF)
September 19, 2019 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE re #5 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Karen Ann Doner, at docket #5 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (JLH, COURT STAFF)
September 18, 2019 Filing 11 Receipt of 300 non-resident attorney payment for Karen A. Doner and Natalie Rainforth Poteeth as to Plaintff K'OYITL'OTS'INA, LTD. re #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Karen A. Doner, #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Natalie Rainforth Poteet (PXS, COURT STAFF)
September 13, 2019 Filing 10 JUDGE SEDWICK TEXT ORDER: The assigned judge recuses from presiding in this case. This case has been re-assigned by random draw to Hon. H. Russel Holland. The case number henceforth will be 4:19-cv-00030-HRH. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
September 12, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM Motion for Preliminary Injunction by K'OYITL'OTS'INA, LTD #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by K'OYITL'OTS'INA, LTD. (Hansen, Steven)
September 12, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by K'OYITL'OTS'INA, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Hansen, Steven)
September 12, 2019 Summons Issued as to Global Food Services LLC and Robert Gottschalk. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 Unissued summons re Defendant R. Gottschalk, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant Global Food Services LLC)(LMH, COURT STAFF)
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Natalie Rainforth Poteet by K'OYITL'OTS'INA, LTD.(Hansen, Steven)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Karen A. Doner by K'OYITL'OTS'INA, LTD.(Hansen, Steven)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by K'OYITL'OTS'INA, LTD. (Hansen, Steven)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by K'OYITL'OTS'INA, LTD. (Hansen, Steven)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Hansen, Steven)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2757823.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hansen, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: K'OYITL'OTS'INA, LTD v. Gottschalk et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Gottschalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Food Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K'OYITL'OTS'INA, LTD
Represented By: Steven S. Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?