Tangwall v. Compton
Appellant: Donald Tangwall
In Re: Margaret A. Bertran
Appellee: Larry D. Compton
Case Number: 4:2019cv00037
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2019 Filing 9 JUDGMENT Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 12/30/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Motion to Dismiss Appeal as Moot, at docket #4 , is GRANTED. This appeal is DISMISSED as moot. The Application to Proceed in the District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs, at docket #3 , is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 12/30/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
December 12, 2019 Filing 7 REPLY in Support re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Appeal as Moot filed by Larry D. Compton. (Christianson, Cabot) Modified on 12/13/2019 to clarify docket text (JLH, COURT STAFF).
December 6, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Appeal as Moot filed by Donald Tangwall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(LMH, COURT STAFF)
December 6, 2019 Filing 5 SLG TEXT ORDER: The clerk of court is directed to docket Mr. Tangwalls recent attempted filings in this matter that respond to the Motion to Dismiss #4 . Although the filings are not in compliance with the Courts Vexatious Litigant Order entered in 4:18-cv-00007-SLG, they are a response to the opposing party's dispositive motion, and will be considered by the court. (LMH, COURT STAFF) Modified on 12/6/2019 (LMH, COURT STAFF).
December 2, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Appeal as Moot by Larry D. Compton.(Christianson, Cabot)
November 26, 2019 Filing 3 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs by Donald Tangwall.(LMH, COURT STAFF)
November 18, 2019 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE OF USDC APPEAL NUMBER re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. cc: Bankruptcy Court. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
November 18, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number BAP No. AK-19-1286 Bk. No. 12-00501. File received, filed by Larry D. Compton. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal and Transmittal of Appeal to BAP, #2 Transmittal Form, #3 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals, #4 Appellee's Statement of Election)(LMH, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tangwall v. Compton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Donald Tangwall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Margaret A. Bertran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Larry D. Compton
Represented By: Cabot C. Christianson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?