Tobias v. Fairbanks Federal Building
Plaintiff: Andreu Tobias
Defendant: Fairbanks Federal Building
Case Number: 4:2020cv00008
Filed: March 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Burgess
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2020 Filing 6 FIRST AMENDED NOTICE OF STAY. Case stayed until June 1, 2020. Signed by Judge Timothy M. Burgess on 5/1/2020. (JDS, COURT STAFF)
April 14, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF STAY. Case stayed until May 1, 2020. Signed by Judge Timothy M. Burgess on 4/14/2020. (JDS, COURT STAFF)
April 13, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Fairbanks Federal Building, filed by Andreu Tobias.(LMH, COURT STAFF)
March 10, 2020 Filing 3 Application to Waive the Filing Fee by Andreu Tobias.(LMH, COURT STAFF)
March 10, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
March 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Fairbanks Federal Building, filed by Andreu Tobias.(LMH, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tobias v. Fairbanks Federal Building
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andreu Tobias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fairbanks Federal Building
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?