Bennett v. Team Industrial Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Earl N. Bennett
Defendant: Team Industrial Services, Inc and Kenneth L Heaps
Case Number: 4:2020cv00011
Filed: March 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Burgess
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2020 Docket Annotation Immediate Action Needed: Your recent electronic filing with the District of Alaska is in error: Wrong Event Selected re: #14 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Earl N. Bennett. ACTION NEEDED: Attorney to refile the document using the event Reply to Response to Motion and link it to the filing at docket #11 . (JDS, COURT STAFF)
May 8, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Earl N. Bennett. (Groseclose, Robert)
May 1, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Kenneth L Heaps, Team Industrial Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Lindemann, Rebecca)
April 22, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D, #2 Exhibit E, #3 Exhibit F, #4 Exhibit G, #5 Exhibit H)(Lindemann, Rebecca)
April 17, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Earl N. Bennett. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Groseclose, Robert)
April 3, 2020 Filing 10 Amended ANSWER to Complaint by All Defendants.(Lindemann, Rebecca)
April 3, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Lindemann, Rebecca)
April 2, 2020 Filing 8 TMB TEXT ORDER vacating re #7 Initial Case Status Report Order pursuant to MGO 20-11. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL CASE STATUS REPORT/CASE SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 21 days of service of this order. Signed by Judge Timothy M. Burgess on 4/1/20. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
March 24, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by All Defendants.(Lindemann, Rebecca)
March 17, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by Team Industrial Services, Inc (Lindemann, Rebecca)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
March 16, 2020 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Team Insdustrial Services, Inc. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
March 16, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet (LMH, COURT STAFF)
March 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Team Insdustrial Services, Inc. from State of Alaska Fourth Judicial District, case number 4FA-20-01224 CI. ( Filing fee $ 400-Receipt #ANC016720), filed by Team Insdustrial Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(LMH, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bennett v. Team Industrial Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earl N. Bennett
Represented By: Robert B. Groseclose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Team Industrial Services, Inc
Represented By: Rebecca A. Lindemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth L Heaps
Represented By: Rebecca A. Lindemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?