Kamin Fairbanks LLC v. Sam's PW, Inc.
Plaintiff: Daniel G Kamin Fairbanks LLC
Defendant: Sam's PW, Inc. and Sam's PW, Inc. doing business as Sam's Club
Case Number: 4:2020cv00012
Filed: April 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: H Russel Holland
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2020 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sam's PW, Inc.. (Slottee, Christopher)
May 28, 2020 Filing 14 Witness List by Daniel G Kamin Fairbanks LLC. (Tiemessen, John)
May 28, 2020 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Daniel G Kamin Fairbanks LLC. (Tiemessen, John)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Fact Discovery closes 4/23/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 7/14/2021. See Order for additional deadlines. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 5/13/20. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
May 6, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by Sam's PW, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Rule 4(f) Affidavit)(Slottee, Christopher)
May 5, 2020 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Tiemessen, John)
April 27, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by Sam's PW, Inc. (Slottee, Christopher)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE MOTIONS TO DISMISS: Advising counsel of the procedure to follow prior to filing a motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 4/22/20. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE INITIAL SCHEDULING & PLANNING CONFERENCE REPORT: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 21 days of service of this order. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 4/20/20. (Attachments: #1 Scheduling and Planning Conference Report)(JLH, COURT STAFF)
April 16, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (KMC, COURT STAFF) Modified on 4/17/2020 to clarify docket text (JLH, COURT STAFF).
April 16, 2020 Filing 5 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by Sam's PW, Inc..(Slottee, Christopher)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (KMC, COURT STAFF)
April 13, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Andrew Scully on behalf of Sam's PW, Inc. (Scully, Peter)
April 10, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Slottee, Christopher)
April 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Sam's PW, Inc. from Superior Court for the State of Alaska at Fairbanks, case number 4FA-20-01385CI. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2862830), filed by Sam's PW, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Slottee, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kamin Fairbanks LLC v. Sam's PW, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel G Kamin Fairbanks LLC
Represented By: John J. Tiemessen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam's PW, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher J. Slottee
Represented By: Peter Andrew Scully
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam's PW, Inc. doing business as Sam's Club
Represented By: Christopher J. Slottee
Represented By: Peter Andrew Scully
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?