Heavner v. Saul
Plaintiff: William Heavner
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 4:2020cv00022
Filed: May 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: John W Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2020 Docket Annotation: For the purpose of tracking the briefing as ordered at docket #11 , when filing the Opening Brief the attorney shall file the document using the event Motion Miscellaneous Relief and text in the relief being sought. Responsive filings should be filed using the event Response in Opposition to Motion or Response to Motion (Non-Opposition). The reply, if any, shall be filed using the event Reply to Response to Motion. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER: Agency record due 60 days after initial appearance; opening brief due 30 days, responsive brief due 30 days, reply brief due 14 days. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 7/10/20. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
July 2, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Heavner. Andrew Saul served on 6/23/2020, answer due 8/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Dellert, Christopher)
June 25, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven E Skrocki on behalf of Andrew Saul (Skrocki, Steven)
June 2, 2020 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE AND RESPONSE: The Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees at docket #3 is granted. Service of Process is to be completed within 90 days. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 6/2/2020. (SDW, COURT STAFF) (Main Document 8 replaced to correct typo and regenerate NEF on 6/2/2020) (SDW, COURT STAFF).
May 29, 2020 **DISREGARD-ENTERED IN ERROR** Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul. (KMC, COURT STAFF) Modified on 6/2/2020 to clarify summons not issued. (SDW, COURT STAFF).
May 29, 2020 Filing 7 Unissued summons re Defendant Andrew Saul, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant USAG, #2 Unissued Summons re Defendant USAO)(KMC, COURT STAFF)
May 29, 2020 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE re #4 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Christopher Dellert, at docket #4 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (SDW, COURT STAFF)
May 29, 2020 Filing 5 Receipt of 150 non-resident attorney payment for Christopher Dellert as to Plaintiff William Heavner. re #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Christopher H. Dellert (PXS, COURT STAFF)
May 23, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Christopher H. Dellert by William Heavner. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Dellert, Christopher)
May 22, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by William Heavner.(KMC, COURT STAFF)
May 22, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet (KMC, COURT STAFF)
May 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul (Filing fee $ 400.), filed by William Heavner.(KMC, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heavner v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Steven E Skrocki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Heavner
Represented By: Christopher H. Dellert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?