Tobias v. Fairbanks Federal Building
Plaintiff: Andreu Tobias
Defendant: Fairbanks Federal Building
Case Number: 4:2020cv00032
Filed: August 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Burgess
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Fairbanks Federal Building, filed by Andreu Tobias.(LMH, COURT STAFF)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCREENING ORDER: Complaint dismissed with leave to amend; Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis at Docket #3 GRANTED. Amended Complaint or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal due by October 26, 2020. Signed by Judge Timothy M. Burgess on 9/24/2020. (JDS, COURT STAFF)
August 26, 2020 Filing 3 Application to Waive the Filing Fee by Andreu Tobias.(LMH, COURT STAFF)
August 26, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet (LMH, COURT STAFF)
August 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Fairbanks Federal Building, filed by Andreu Tobias.(LMH, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tobias v. Fairbanks Federal Building
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andreu Tobias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fairbanks Federal Building
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?