Whaley v. State of Alaska et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Whaley
Defendant: Department of Public Safety, Safariland, LLC, State of Alaska and State of Alaska, Department of Public Safety
Case Number: 4:2021cv00006
Filed: April 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: John W Sedwick
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Discovery due by 4/22/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 5/23/2022. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 6/1/21. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
May 27, 2021 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Bray, Aisha)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE INITIAL SCHEDULING & PLANNING CONFERENCE REPORT: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 21 days of service of this order. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 5/6/21. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
April 20, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by Department of Public Safety, State of Alaska (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S)(Bray, Aisha)
April 19, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by Department of Public Safety, State of Alaska (Bray, Aisha)
April 16, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Safariland, LLC. (Hozubin, Rebecca)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (KMC, COURT STAFF)
April 12, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Bray, Aisha)
April 12, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State of Alaska, Department of Public Safety from Fairbanks Superior Court, case number 4FA-20-02322CI. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 097--3052522), filed by State of Alaska, Department of Public Safety. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Bray, Aisha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whaley v. State of Alaska et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Public Safety
Represented By: Aisha Tinker Bray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safariland, LLC
Represented By: Rebecca J. Hozubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Alaska
Represented By: Aisha Tinker Bray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Alaska, Department of Public Safety
Represented By: Aisha Tinker Bray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Whaley
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Barber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?